Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:21-ap-03026
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:May 19, 2021
Terminated:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
H6 Aircraft, L.L.C. d/b/a Hangar 6,
Represented By
H6 Aircraft, L.L.C. d/b/a Hangar 6,
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Paula S. Beran
Tavenner & Beran, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Thursday, April 03, 2025
7 7 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Thu 04/03 5:02 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Dietz, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 04/01 3:30 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Paula S. Beran of Tavenner & Beran, PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Beran, Paula)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/07 2:57 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Paula S. Beran of Tavenner & Beran, PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Beran, Paula)
Related: [-] related document(s)3 Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY
Friday, May 21, 2021
4 4 court Receipt of Adversary/Miscellaneous Proceeding Filing Fee Fri 05/21 6:00 PM
Receipt of Adversary/Miscellaneous Filing Fee. Receipt Number 118898. Fee Amount $350.00. (stehlem)
Related: [-]
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY Fri 05/21 3:15 PM
Summons and notice issued to H6 Aircraft, L.L.C. d/b/a Hangar 6, Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
Thursday, May 20, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 05/20 11:17 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 21-03026 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number Check, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (Jones)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 05/19 5:19 PM
Adversary case 21-03026 Complaint against H6 Aircraft, L.L.C. d/b/a Hangar 6, filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Beran, Paula)
Related: [-]