Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:21-ap-03027
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:May 19, 2021
Terminated:Jan 19, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
LiteIdeas, LLC
Represented By
LiteIdeas, LLC
contact info
Defendant
LiteSheet Solutions, LLC
Represented By
LiteSheet Solutions, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Paula S. Beran
Tavenner & Beran, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
11 11 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Wed 01/19 12:48 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
10 10 misc Stipulation Tue 01/18 1:41 PM
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal By Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee and Between LiteIdeas, LLC and LiteSheet Solutions, LLC filed by Paula S. Beran of Tavenner & Beran, PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Beran, Paula)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
9 9 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 09/21 1:55 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Richard C. Maxwell of Woods Rogers PLC. on behalf of LiteIdeas, LLC, LiteSheet Solutions, LLC. (Maxwell, Richard)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
8 8 answer None Tue 09/21 1:52 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Richard C. Maxwell of Woods Rogers PLC. on behalf of LiteIdeas, LLC, LiteSheet Solutions, LLC. (Maxwell, Richard)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, September 17, 2021
7 7 court Deficient Filing Notice Request Fri 09/17 4:01 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing Issued to Richard C. Maxwell regarding Incorrect event code used to docket pleading Related [+] Document(s) due by 10/1/2021. (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Answer to Complaint filed by LiteIdeas, LLC, LiteSheet Solutions, LLC
Thursday, September 16, 2021
6 6 answer None Thu 09/16 3:29 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Richard C. Maxwell of Woods Rogers PLC. on behalf of LiteIdeas, LLC, LiteSheet Solutions, LLC. (Maxwell, Richard)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/07 2:52 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Paula S. Beran of Tavenner & Beran, PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Beran, Paula)
Related: [-] related document(s)3 Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY
Friday, May 21, 2021
4 4 court Receipt of Adversary/Miscellaneous Proceeding Filing Fee Fri 05/21 6:00 PM
Receipt of Adversary/Miscellaneous Filing Fee. Receipt Number 118898. Fee Amount $350.00. (stehlem)
Related: [-]
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY Fri 05/21 3:16 PM
Summons and notice issued to LiteIdeas, LLC ; LiteSheet Solutions, LLC Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
Thursday, May 20, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 05/20 11:17 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 21-03027 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number Check, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (Jones)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 05/19 5:27 PM
Adversary case 21-03027 Complaint against LiteIdeas, LLC, LiteSheet Solutions, LLC filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Beran, Paula)
Related: [-]