Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Michael M Baylson
Referred: David R Strawbridge
Case #: 2:21-cv-02587
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:203 Equal Pay Act
Case Filed:Jun 08, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Dec 05, 2021 3:57 AM EST
Defendant
Central Bucks School District
Represented By
DAVID WILLIAM BROWN
Levin Legal Group, P.C.
contact info
MICHAEL I. LEVIN
Levin Legal Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dawn Marinello
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info

GPO Nov 24 2021
MEMORANDUM; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 11/23/21. 11/24/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
GPO Nov 24 2021
ORDER THAT THESE CASES ARE CONSOLIDATED FOR ALL PURPOSES EXCEPT FOR TRIAL. COUNSEL SHALL DISCUSS AND SUBMIT EITHER JOINT OR SEPARATE SCHEDULING ORDERS BY 12/13/21; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 11/23/21. 11/24/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
GPO Jun 27 2022
MEMORANDUM; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/27/22. 6/27/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
GPO Jun 27 2022
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF REBECCA CARTEE-HARING'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/27/22. 6/27/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
GPO Aug 24 2022
MEMORANDUM; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/24/22. 8/24/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
GPO Aug 24 2022
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL CERTIFICATION IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION OF THIS ACTION TO PROCEED AS A COLLECTIVE ACTION IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/24/22. 8/24/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED. (JL)
GPO Oct 31 2022
MEMORANDUM; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 10/31/22. 10/31/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
GPO Oct 31 2022
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CERTIFY ORDER FOR APPEAL IS DENIED. DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR A STAY INCLUDED IN THE SAME FILING IS ALSO DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 10/31/22. 10/31/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
GPO May 15 2024
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 5/15/24. 5/15/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
GPO May 15 2024
MEMORANDUM & ORDER THAT Central Bucks Motion for Summary Judgment (21-2587, ECF 161 and 20-1995, ECF 131) and Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (21-2587, ECF 163 and 20-1995, ECF 135) are denied. Defendant filed in error its Motion for Summary Judgment as ECF 158 (21-2587) before refiling as ECF 161. ECF 158 (21-2587) is denied as moot. Central Bucks Motion to Decertify Collective Action (ECF 159) is also denied. The Court will require all parties to engage in a mediation to consider a settlement of all claims, as a trial of this case would likely take several weeks or more. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 5/15/24. 5/15/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED. (fdc)
GPO Jun 05 2024
MEMORANDUM; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/5/24. 6/5/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
GPO Jun 05 2024
ORDER THAT I HAVE DECIDED THE BEST COURSE OF ACTION IS NOT TO RECUSE AT THIS TIME, BUT TO INVITE EITHER OR BOTH PARTIES TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECUSAL AND TO STATE IN DETAIL ANY REASONS THEY HAVE IN ADDITION TO THE RELATIONSHIP OF MY SON-IN-LAW. THIS MOTION MUST BE FILED WITHIN 7 DAYS; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/5/24. 6/5/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
GPO Jun 06 2024
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/6/24. 6/6/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
GPO Jul 02 2024
MEMORANDUM; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 7/2/24. 7/3/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
GPO Jul 02 2024
ORDER THAT (1) PLAINTIFFS MAY PROCEED AT TRIAL WITH TESTIMONY FROM THREE (3) OR FOUR (4) REPRESENTATIVE FEMALE TEACHERS;(2) PLAINTIFFS WILL FILE AN OFFER OF PROOF IDENTIFYING ONE MALE COMPARATOR TO TESTIFY AT TRIAL BY JULY 12, 2024, WHICH THE COURT WILL CONSIDER AT A FINAL HEARING TO BE HELD PRIOR TO JURY SELECTION ON JULY 22, 2024;(3) BY JULY 19, 2024, DEFENDANT SHALL IDENTIFY A MAXIMUM OF THREE (3) OR FOUR (4) ADDITIONAL MALE COMPARATORS;(4) IF EITHER OR BOTH PARTIES HAVE IDENTIFIED STATISTICAL EVIDENCE (SEE 21-2587, ECF 219; 20-1995, ECF 180), THE COURT WILL CONSIDER ADMITTING THIS EVIDENCE AFTER THE FINAL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JULY 22, AND/OR AT TRIAL.(5) COUNSEL MAY SUBMIT A LEGAL MEMORANDUM ON THESE ISSUES NO LATER THAN JULY 18, 2024. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 7/2/24. 7/3/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED. (JL)
GPO Apr 09 2025
MEMORANDUM; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/9/25. 4/9/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
GPO Apr 09 2025
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF MASTER IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/9/25. 4/9/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
GPO Apr 09 2025
MEMORANDUM; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/9/25. 4/9/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL) (Main Document 395 replaced on 4/9/2025) (jl).
GPO Apr 09 2025
ORDER THAT FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE FOREGOING MEMORANDUM, THE PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO REFER TO THE ORDERS RE POST-TRIAL RULE 50 MOTIONS (C.A. 20-CV-1995, ECF 324; C.A. 21-CV-2587, ECF 367) FILED PRIOR TO THIS MEMORANDUM ON MARCH 21, 2025, FOR THE SPECIFIC RULINGS; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/9/25. 4/9/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
443 443 minutes Jury Trial - Held Tue 05/06 5:17 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON Jury Trial DAY 2 held on 5/6/25. Court Reporter: ESR. (JL)
Related: [-]
442 442 order Order for Lunch Tue 05/06 8:31 AM
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PA IS HEREBY DIRECTED TO FURNISH REFRESHMENTS FOR 8 JURORS ENGAGED IN THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 5/6/25. 5/6/25 ENTERED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
441 441 minutes Jury Trial - Begun Mon 05/05 4:49 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON Jury Trial DAY 1 held on 5/5/25 Court Reporter: ESR. (JL)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 03, 2025
440 440 trial Trial Brief Sat 05/03 3:45 PM
TRIAL BRIEF (REVISED) by Central Bucks School District. Certificate of Service(BROWN, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit PX-1A,
Att: 2 Exhibit PX-1B,
Att: 3 Exhibit D-578,
Att: 4 Exhibit D-602,
Att: 5 Exhibit D-3152
439 439 motion In Limine Sat 05/03 3:28 PM
MOTION in Limine filed by Central Bucks School District.Certificate of Service.(BROWN, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit PX-1A,
Att: 2 Exhibit PX-1B,
Att: 3 Exhibit PX-11,
Att: 4 Exhibit PX-12,
Att: 5 Exhibit D-597,
Att: 6 Exhibit D-600,
Att: 7 Exhibit D-602,
Att: 8 Memorandum,
Att: 9 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, May 02, 2025
438 438 25 pgs trial Trial Brief Fri 05/02 10:15 PM
TRIAL BRIEF by Central Bucks School District. Certificate of Service(BROWN, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit PX-1A,
Att: 2 Exhibit PX-1B,
Att: 3 Exhibit D-578,
Att: 4 Exhibit D-602,
Att: 5 Exhibit D-3152
437 437 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Fri 05/02 2:22 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 5/2/25.5/2/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
436 436 1 pgs order Order on Motion in Limine Fri 05/02 2:20 PM
ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO BAR PLAINTIFFS FROM PRESENTING EVIDENCE ARGUMENT AND EXHIBITS REGARDING CREDIT OR STEP PLACEMENT FOR PRIOR EXPERIENCE (CASE NO. 21-2587 ECF 381, RESPONSE AT ECF 404; CASE NO. 20-1995 ECF 338, RESPONSE AT 361), IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART.; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 5/2/25.5/2/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
435 435 motion Reconsideration Thu 05/01 11:09 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re429 Order,,, filed by Central Bucks School District.Certificate of Service.(BROWN, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
434 434 trial Proposed Voir Dire Thu 05/01 9:35 AM
Proposed Voir Dire by Dawn Marinello. 05/01/2025 (MAZUREK, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
433 433 1 pgs order Order Thu 05/01 8:36 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MUST FILE THEIR VOIR DIRE REQUESTS BY 5/2/25 AT NOON. THE REQUESTS WERE DUE ON 4/25/25 PER THE COURT'S FEBRUARY 27, 2025 SCHEDULING ORDER; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 5/1/25. 5/1/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
432 432 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 04/29 11:50 AM
ORDER THAT THE JOINT MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL IS DENIED. TRIAL WILL START ON 5/5/25 AT 9:30 A.M. WITH JURY SELECTION; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/29/25.4/29/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]