Consolidated
Lead case: 2:21-cv-02587

Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Michael M Baylson
Case #: 2:25-cv-00033
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2025
Last checked: Monday Feb 17, 2025 3:53 AM EST
Defendant
CENTRAL BUCKS SCHOOL DISTRICT
Defendant
JOHN DOE
Defendant
ROBERT DUGGER
Defendant
DANA FOLEY
Defendant
SUSAN GIBSON
Defendant
RICK HARING
Defendant
DANIEL KIMICATA
Defendant
JAMES PEPPER
Defendant
HEATHER REYNOLDS
Defendant
RITA ROE
Defendant
KAREN SMITH
Defendant
JENINE ZDANOWICZ
Plaintiff
Karyn Jakubik
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
SUSAN ANGSTADT-SULLIVAN
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KIMBERLY ARNOLD
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kristine Ahlquist
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
AMY BACH
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
VASILIKI BALLIOS DARDESHI
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
TANYA BARONE-DURANT
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KATHRYN SONNIE BARTON
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ANGELQUE BERCIK
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MOLLY BEYER
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DENISE BUCHER
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KATHLEEN BUDNIEWSKI
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
STEPHANIE BYRNE
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MEGHANN CAMPBELL
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LISA CANFIELD
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SHARON CASCIOLE
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LISA CIRULLI
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JOAN COLLIER
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LYNDA COSTELLO
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LORI CUCINOTTA
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CATHERINE DANGLER
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
BRENDA DAVIS
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ELIZABETH DECKER
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SHARON DEFONTENY
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ELIZABETH DIFRANCEISCO
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
THERESA DIVITA
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JENNIFER DIXSON
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LORETTA DOGGENDORF
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTINE DOLLARTON
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DEBRA DURICk
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LAURA DURNS
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
AILEEN EDELEN
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MAUREEN FABICK
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CARA FAHEY
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JULIA FALONE
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MARGARET FELSOCI-MATTIA
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LYDIA FICHTMAN
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ELIZABETH FILIPE
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KRISTA FIRELY
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHELLE FRONHEISER
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SAMANTHA GAMBLES
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
TAMI GILL
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LAURA GILLIAM
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERTA GLUCK
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
HOLLY GRAHAM
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MARGARET HAFLETT
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CHARLOTTE HARRINGTON
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KAREN HAUCK
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CYNTHIA HENSLER
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
STACEY HICKMOTT
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CAROL HUGHES
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MARGARET HUTCHINSON
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CYNTHIA JANSEN
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KELLY JONES
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
AMY KALLELIS
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
RITA KENEFIC
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KATHY KERSUL-WIENER
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MARIANNE KESSLER
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KIMBERLY KEYES
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KIMBERLY KING
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LORRAINE KING
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
RUTH KISTNER
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SONYA KOSC
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MARIE KRUOPAS
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
RACHEL LANG
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KIMBERLEE LEONARDO
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
REBECCA LEVY
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KATHERINE LEYLAND
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LAUREN MAGEE
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ALYSSA MARUCCI
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DIANNE MATTESON
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CARLA MCCAMBRIDGE
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KRISTEN MCCUEN
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTINE MCLAUGHLIN
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MARGARET MELISSEN
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
STEPHANIE MERSON
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTY MICUCCI
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KAREN MINOGUE
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
AMANDA MOFFA
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LINDA MONKOSKI
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DOROTHY MOODY
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JENNIFER MURPHY
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ANNE FITZPATRICK MURRAY
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ELIZABETH NISZCZAK
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
RACHEL NULTY
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
EVE PACKAL
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KIMBERLY PALMER
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MAYSOON PARK-HUATUCO
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DORINA PASSIO
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SHARON PAYNE
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
NANCY PHILLIPS
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DEBORA REPPA
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KRISTEN REYNOLDS
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
COLLEEN ROSINI
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBIN RYAN
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
AMY LYNN SALLA
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
STACEY SAND
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KATHRYN SCHMOYER
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ERIN SCHOLL
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MARYKATE SCHRACK
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DIANE SCHUTE
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTINE SCOTT
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JUDITH SELIGMAN
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
PATTI SHELLY
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SUZANNE SHERENIAN
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JENNIFER SILVERS
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LEEANN STORY
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KRISTY STRYJAK
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JENNIFER STUHLTRAGER
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JEANETTE SWANTEK
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JULIA SZARKO
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KRISTA SZCZYPIORSKI
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KELLY SZEMANEK
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
BONNIE TRANSUE
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MARGARET TREON
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DIANE VILLOTTI
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KIRBY VUOCOLO
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LAUREN WALLACE
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
TRACI WALTER-VEVERKA
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTYN WEBER
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MELISSA WILLIS
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ANGELA WOODROW
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LEANNE YERKES
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LYNN YETTO
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CLAUDIA YOUNG
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KAREN YUKNUS
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
TAMARA ZAKUTO
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JACQUELYN CARMEANS
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
TINA L. FITZGERALD
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
EDWARD S. MAZUREK
The Mazurek Law Firm LLC
contact info

GPO Mar 12 2025
MEMORANDUM RE: EQUAL PAY ACT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 3/12/2025. 3/12/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)

Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/11 10:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL D. KRISTOFCO on behalf of CENTRAL BUCKS SCHOOL DISTRICT, ROBERT DUGGER, DANA FOLEY, SUSAN GIBSON, RICK HARING, DANIEL KIMICATA, JAMES PEPPER, HEATHER REYNOLDS, KAREN SMITH, JENINE ZDANOWICZ with Certificate of Service(KRISTOFCO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
8 8 22 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Wed 03/12 3:13 PM
MEMORANDUM RE: EQUAL PAY ACT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 3/12/2025. 3/12/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
7 7 appeal USCA Notice of Docketing ROA Thu 02/20 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re6 Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Payment),,,,,,,,, filed by JOAN COLLIER, DEBRA DURICk, KATHERINE LEYLAND, ROBIN RYAN, KAREN YUKNUS, STACEY SAND, MARIE KRUOPAS, CHRISTY MICUCCI, MARGARET MELISSEN, DENISE BUCHER, SHARON DEFONTENY, CHRISTINE MCLAUGHLIN, THERESA DIVITA, DIANE SCHUTE, LYNN YETTO, SHARON CASCIOLE, DIANE VILLOTTI, JENNIFER SILVERS, CHRISTINE SCOTT, COLLEEN ROSINI, CHRISTINE DOLLARTON, AILEEN EDELEN, KIRBY VUOCOLO, MARIANNE KESSLER, JENNIFER DIXSON, LORI CUCINOTTA, LORETTA DOGGENDORF, KRISTA FIRELY, KIMBERLY KING, TRACI WALTER-VEVERKA, JULIA SZARKO, TAMARA ZAKUTO, ERIN SCHOLL, JUDITH SELIGMAN, ELIZABETH DIFRANCEISCO, STEPHANIE MERSON, LYNDA COSTELLO, TINA L. FITZGERALD, CLAUDIA YOUNG, CATHERINE DANGLER, LEANNE YERKES, KIMBERLY PALMER, RITA KENEFIC, TANYA BARONE-DURANT, ELIZABETH NISZCZAK, Karyn Jakubik, CARA FAHEY, KATHRYN SONNIE BARTON, ANNE FITZPATRICK MURRAY, KRISTY STRYJAK, MAUREEN FABICK, VASILIKI BALLIOS DARDESHI, CHARLOTTE HARRINGTON, PATTI SHELLY, KATHRYN SCHMOYER, STEPHANIE BYRNE, MARYKATE SCHRACK, LYDIA FICHTMAN, CYNTHIA JANSEN, AMANDA MOFFA, MARGARET TREON, AMY LYNN SALLA, MARGARET HAFLETT, LINDA MONKOSKI, SONYA KOSC, REBECCA LEVY, MARGARET FELSOCI-MATTIA, CHRISTYN WEBER, LAURA DURNS, EVE PACKAL, RACHEL LANG, LAUREN MAGEE, JENNIFER STUHLTRAGER, DIANNE MATTESON, DORINA PASSIO, JULIA FALONE, ANGELA WOODROW, MELISSA WILLIS, BRENDA DAVIS, Kristine Ahlquist, RACHEL NULTY, AMY BACH, ELIZABETH FILIPE, KIMBERLY ARNOLD, SHARON PAYNE, DEBORA REPPA, SUSAN ANGSTADT-SULLIVAN, LISA CIRULLI, SAMANTHA GAMBLES, CYNTHIA HENSLER, TAMI GILL, DOROTHY MOODY, LAURA GILLIAM, ALYSSA MARUCCI, NANCY PHILLIPS, KRISTEN REYNOLDS, KATHLEEN BUDNIEWSKI, KELLY JONES, MARGARET HUTCHINSON, KELLY SZEMANEK, ROBERTA GLUCK, SUZANNE SHERENIAN, CAROL HUGHES, STACEY HICKMOTT, ELIZABETH DECKER, CARLA MCCAMBRIDGE, MOLLY BEYER, JENNIFER MURPHY, KAREN HAUCK, RUTH KISTNER, KIMBERLEE LEONARDO, LISA CANFIELD, MEGHANN CAMPBELL, ANGELQUE BERCIK, KAREN MINOGUE, HOLLY GRAHAM, BONNIE TRANSUE, KRISTEN MCCUEN, AMY KALLELIS, JACQUELYN CARMEANS, MICHELLE FRONHEISER, KRISTA SZCZYPIORSKI, JEANETTE SWANTEK, LEEANN STORY, LORRAINE KING, LAUREN WALLACE, MAYSOON PARK-HUATUCO, KATHY KERSUL-WIENER, KIMBERLY KEYES. USCA Case Number 25-1279 (dt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
6 6 appeal Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Payment) Wed 02/12 6:44 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by SUSAN ANGSTADT-SULLIVAN, KIMBERLY ARNOLD, Kristine Ahlquist, AMY BACH, VASILIKI BALLIOS DARDESHI, TANYA BARONE-DURANT, KATHRYN SONNIE BARTON, ANGELQUE BERCIK, MOLLY BEYER, DENISE BUCHER, KATHLEEN BUDNIEWSKI, STEPHANIE BYRNE, MEGHANN CAMPBELL, LISA CANFIELD, JACQUELYN CARMEANS, SHARON CASCIOLE, LISA CIRULLI, JOAN COLLIER, LYNDA COSTELLO, LORI CUCINOTTA, CATHERINE DANGLER, BRENDA DAVIS, ELIZABETH DECKER, SHARON DEFONTENY, ELIZABETH DIFRANCEISCO, THERESA DIVITA, JENNIFER DIXSON, LORETTA DOGGENDORF, CHRISTINE DOLLARTON, DEBRA DURICk, LAURA DURNS, AILEEN EDELEN, MAUREEN FABICK, CARA FAHEY, JULIA FALONE, MARGARET FELSOCI-MATTIA, LYDIA FICHTMAN, ELIZABETH FILIPE, KRISTA FIRELY, TINA L. FITZGERALD, MICHELLE FRONHEISER, SAMANTHA GAMBLES, TAMI GILL, LAURA GILLIAM, ROBERTA GLUCK, HOLLY GRAHAM, MARGARET HAFLETT, CHARLOTTE HARRINGTON, KAREN HAUCK, CYNTHIA HENSLER, STACEY HICKMOTT, CAROL HUGHES, MARGARET HUTCHINSON, CYNTHIA JANSEN, KELLY JONES, Karyn Jakubik, AMY KALLELIS, RITA KENEFIC, KATHY KERSUL-WIENER, MARIANNE KESSLER, KIMBERLY KEYES, KIMBERLY KING, LORRAINE KING, RUTH KISTNER, SONYA KOSC, MARIE KRUOPAS, RACHEL LANG, KIMBERLEE LEONARDO, REBECCA LEVY, KATHERINE LEYLAND, LAUREN MAGEE, ALYSSA MARUCCI, DIANNE MATTESON, CARLA MCCAMBRIDGE, KRISTEN MCCUEN, CHRISTINE MCLAUGHLIN, MARGARET MELISSEN, STEPHANIE MERSON, CHRISTY MICUCCI, KAREN MINOGUE, AMANDA MOFFA, LINDA MONKOSKI, DOROTHY MOODY, JENNIFER MURPHY, ANNE FITZPATRICK MURRAY, ELIZABETH NISZCZAK, RACHEL NULTY, EVE PACKAL, KIMBERLY PALMER, MAYSOON PARK-HUATUCO, DORINA PASSIO, SHARON PAYNE, NANCY PHILLIPS, DEBORA REPPA, KRISTEN REYNOLDS, COLLEEN ROSINI, ROBIN RYAN, AMY LYNN SALLA, STACEY SAND, KATHRYN SCHMOYER, ERIN SCHOLL, MARYKATE SCHRACK, DIANE SCHUTE, CHRISTINE SCOTT, JUDITH SELIGMAN, PATTI SHELLY, SUZANNE SHERENIAN, JENNIFER SILVERS, LEEANN STORY, KRISTY STRYJAK, JENNIFER STUHLTRAGER, JEANETTE SWANTEK, JULIA SZARKO, KRISTA SZCZYPIORSKI, KELLY SZEMANEK, BONNIE TRANSUE, MARGARET TREON, DIANE VILLOTTI, KIRBY VUOCOLO, LAUREN WALLACE, TRACI WALTER-VEVERKA, CHRISTYN WEBER, MELISSA WILLIS, ANGELA WOODROW, LEANNE YERKES, LYNN YETTO, CLAUDIA YOUNG, KAREN YUKNUS, TAMARA ZAKUTO. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number APAEDC-18071310. IFP Notice of Appeal (MAZUREK, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/12 6:42 PM
NOTICE by SUSAN ANGSTADT-SULLIVAN, KIMBERLY ARNOLD, Kristine Ahlquist, AMY BACH, VASILIKI BALLIOS DARDESHI, TANYA BARONE-DURANT, KATHRYN SONNIE BARTON, ANGELQUE BERCIK, MOLLY BEYER, DENISE BUCHER, KATHLEEN BUDNIEWSKI, STEPHANIE BYRNE, MEGHANN CAMPBELL, LISA CANFIELD, JACQUELYN CARMEANS, SHARON CASCIOLE, LISA CIRULLI, JOAN COLLIER, LYNDA COSTELLO, LORI CUCINOTTA, CATHERINE DANGLER, BRENDA DAVIS, ELIZABETH DECKER, SHARON DEFONTENY, ELIZABETH DIFRANCEISCO, THERESA DIVITA, JENNIFER DIXSON, LORETTA DOGGENDORF, CHRISTINE DOLLARTON, DEBRA DURICk, LAURA DURNS, AILEEN EDELEN, MAUREEN FABICK, CARA FAHEY, JULIA FALONE, MARGARET FELSOCI-MATTIA, LYDIA FICHTMAN, ELIZABETH FILIPE, KRISTA FIRELY, TINA L. FITZGERALD, MICHELLE FRONHEISER, SAMANTHA GAMBLES, TAMI GILL, LAURA GILLIAM, ROBERTA GLUCK, HOLLY GRAHAM, MARGARET HAFLETT, CHARLOTTE HARRINGTON, KAREN HAUCK, CYNTHIA HENSLER, STACEY HICKMOTT, CAROL HUGHES, MARGARET HUTCHINSON, CYNTHIA JANSEN, KELLY JONES, Karyn Jakubik, AMY KALLELIS, RITA KENEFIC, KATHY KERSUL-WIENER, MARIANNE KESSLER, KIMBERLY KEYES, KIMBERLY KING, LORRAINE KING, RUTH KISTNER, SONYA KOSC, MARIE KRUOPAS, RACHEL LANG, KIMBERLEE LEONARDO, REBECCA LEVY, KATHERINE LEYLAND, LAUREN MAGEE, ALYSSA MARUCCI, DIANNE MATTESON, CARLA MCCAMBRIDGE, KRISTEN MCCUEN, CHRISTINE MCLAUGHLIN, MARGARET MELISSEN, STEPHANIE MERSON, CHRISTY MICUCCI, KAREN MINOGUE, AMANDA MOFFA, LINDA MONKOSKI, DOROTHY MOODY, JENNIFER MURPHY, ANNE FITZPATRICK MURRAY, ELIZABETH NISZCZAK, RACHEL NULTY, EVE PACKAL, KIMBERLY PALMER, MAYSOON PARK-HUATUCO, DORINA PASSIO, SHARON PAYNE, NANCY PHILLIPS, DEBORA REPPA, KRISTEN REYNOLDS, COLLEEN ROSINI, ROBIN RYAN, AMY LYNN SALLA, STACEY SAND, KATHRYN SCHMOYER, ERIN SCHOLL, MARYKATE SCHRACK, DIANE SCHUTE, CHRISTINE SCOTT, JUDITH SELIGMAN, PATTI SHELLY, SUZANNE SHERENIAN, JENNIFER SILVERS, LEEANN STORY, KRISTY STRYJAK, JENNIFER STUHLTRAGER, JEANETTE SWANTEK, JULIA SZARKO, KRISTA SZCZYPIORSKI, KELLY SZEMANEK, BONNIE TRANSUE, MARGARET TREON, DIANE VILLOTTI, KIRBY VUOCOLO, LAUREN WALLACE, TRACI WALTER-VEVERKA, CHRISTYN WEBER, MELISSA WILLIS, ANGELA WOODROW, LEANNE YERKES, LYNN YETTO, CLAUDIA YOUNG, KAREN YUKNUS, TAMARA ZAKUTO of Election to Stand Upon Original Complaint (MAZUREK, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 01/16 3:01 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF KARYN JAKUBIK MAY HAVE UNTIL 2/12/2025 TO FILE HER AMENDED COMPLAINT REMOVING THE ALLEGATIONS OF THE DISMISSED PLAINTIFFS, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE COURT'S 1/13/2025 ORDER. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 1/16/2025. 1/16/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
3 3 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Mon 01/13 1:05 PM
ORDER THAT ALL PLAINTIFFS OTHER THAN THE FIRST-NAMED PLAINTIFF, KARYN JAKUBIK, ARE DISMISSED FROM THIS LAWSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO FILING THEIR OWN INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS IN SEPARATE LAWSUITS. ONLY THE CLAIMS OF THE FIRST NAMED PLAINITFF, KARYN JAKUBIK, WILL PROCEED AGAINST THE DEFENDANTS IN THIS LITIGATION. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF KARYN JAKUBIK MUST FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT REMOVING THE ALLEGATIONS OF THE DISMISSED PLAINTIFFS WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 1/13/2025. 1/13/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 01/06 12:43 PM
Summons Issued as to CENTRAL BUCKS SCHOOL DISTRICT, ROBERT DUGGER, DANA FOLEY, SUSAN GIBSON, RICK HARING, DANIEL KIMICATA, JAMES PEPPER, HEATHER REYNOLDS, RITA ROE, KAREN SMITH, JENINE ZDANOWICZ. Forwarded To: Counsel on 1/6/2025. (ahf)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 01/03 5:48 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17978035.), filed by AILEEN EDELEN, CLAUDIA YOUNG, DORINA PASSIO, ALYSSA MARUCCI, DIANE VILLOTTI, DIANE SCHUTE, JOAN COLLIER, LEANNE YERKES, SHARON CASCIOLE, LAURA GILLIAM, KELLY JONES, ANNE FITZPATRICK MURRAY, JENNIFER DIXSON, COLLEEN ROSINI, RITA KENEFIC, LORI CUCINOTTA, LEEANN STORY, MAYSOON PARK-HUATUCO, LAURA DURNS, JULIA FALONE, KATHLEEN BUDNIEWSKI, CHRISTY MICUCCI, DEBORA REPPA, SUZANNE SHERENIAN, MARIE KRUOPAS, CHRISTINE DOLLARTON, KRISTA SZCZYPIORSKI, KATHY KERSUL-WIENER, JACQUELYN CARMEANS, LINDA MONKOSKI, KIMBERLY KEYES, CARLA MCCAMBRIDGE, MARYKATE SCHRACK, RACHEL NULTY, MARGARET MELISSEN, LORRAINE KING, KIMBERLEE LEONARDO, TAMARA ZAKUTO, LISA CIRULLI, Kristine Ahlquist, DOROTHY MOODY, KRISTY STRYJAK, LISA CANFIELD, KATHERINE LEYLAND, JEANETTE SWANTEK, KAREN HAUCK, SHARON DEFONTENY, ANGELA WOODROW, JUDITH SELIGMAN, KAREN MINOGUE, TRACI WALTER-VEVERKA, ELIZABETH DECKER, ROBIN RYAN, LYNN YETTO, MARGARET HAFLETT, ANGELQUE BERCIK, STACEY SAND, LYDIA FICHTMAN, TAMI GILL, MARGARET TREON, AMY BACH, MAUREEN FABICK, CATHERINE DANGLER, RUTH KISTNER, TANYA BARONE-DURANT, THERESA DIVITA, AMANDA MOFFA, KIRBY VUOCOLO, KATHRYN SCHMOYER, DIANNE MATTESON, KRISTEN MCCUEN, KIMBERLY KING, KATHRYN SONNIE BARTON, KELLY SZEMANEK, NANCY PHILLIPS, CHRISTINE SCOTT, DENISE BUCHER, JULIA SZARKO, SHARON PAYNE, JENNIFER SILVERS, CHARLOTTE HARRINGTON, EVE PACKAL, STEPHANIE MERSON, MELISSA WILLIS, CYNTHIA HENSLER, KRISTA FIRELY, SONYA KOSC, AMY LYNN SALLA, STEPHANIE BYRNE, MICHELLE FRONHEISER, CAROL HUGHES, AMY KALLELIS, ROBERTA GLUCK, RACHEL LANG, LYNDA COSTELLO, CYNTHIA JANSEN, LAUREN MAGEE, REBECCA LEVY, Karyn Jakubik, BONNIE TRANSUE, KIMBERLY PALMER, DEBRA DURICk, ERIN SCHOLL, ELIZABETH DIFRANCEISCO, KAREN YUKNUS, LORETTA DOGGENDORF, LAUREN WALLACE, TINA FITZGERALD, CHRISTINE MCLAUGHLIN, JENNIFER MURPHY, MARIANNE KESSLER, MARGARET HUTCHINSON, CHRISTYN WEBER, BRENDA DAVIS, SAMANTHA GAMBLES, HOLLY GRAHAM, MEGHANN CAMPBELL, PATTI SHELLY, VASILIKI BALLIOS DARDESHI, ELIZABETH NISZCZAK, SUSAN ANGSTADT-SULLIVAN, MARGARET FELSOCI-MATTIA, KRISTEN REYNOLDS, MOLLY BEYER, JENNIFER STUHLTRAGER, STACEY HICKMOTT, ELIZABETH FILIPE, KIMBERLY ARNOLD, CARA FAHEY.(MAZUREK, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form