Kansas District Court
Judge:Eric F Melgren
Referred: Rachel E Schwartz
Case #: 2:21-cv-02264
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2021
Terminated:Mar 09, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 07, 2021 3:14 AM CST
Defendant
City Cycle Sales, Inc.
1021 Goldenbelt Blvd
Junction City, KS 66441
Represented By
Cynthia J. Sheppeard
Goodell, Stratton, Edmonds & Palmer, Llp - Topeka
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeremy Leon Harris
Represented By
Thomas J. Dickerson
Dickerson Oxton, LLC
contact info
Daniel Adam Kopp
Rouse Frets White Goss Gentile Rhodes, Pc - Leawood
contact info
Rachel Nelson Boden
Rouse Frets White Goss Gentile Rhodes, Pc - Leawood
contact info
Jeffrey D. Rowe
Rouse Frets White Goss Gentile Rhodes, Pc - Leawood
contact info
R. Douglas Gentile
Rouse Frets White Goss Gentile Rhodes, Pc - Leawood
contact info

GPO Apr 13 2022
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 4/13/2022. (ca)
GPO Oct 18 2022
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 10/18/2022. (ca)
GPO May 26 2023
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 103 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 103 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 5/26/2023. (jal)
GPO Jun 06 2023
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees (Doc. 99) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FUTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff share his attorneys' billing records, reasonably redacted if necessary, with Defense counsel, and will initiate a second consultation regarding attorney's fees. Only after filing a statement of consultation with this Court will Plaintiff be permitted to file a second motion for attorney's fees. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 6/6/2023. (jal)
GPO Aug 02 2023
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 119 Defendant's Motion for Stay of Execution and for an Order Approving Supersedeas Bond. The Amended Judgment in this case, dated 3/23/2023, is stayed pending the resolution of the appeal upon Defendant posting a supersedeas bond in the amount of $2,030,761.90. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 8/2/2023. (mam)
GPO Sep 22 2023
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 129 Plaintiff's Second Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses in the amount of $700,378.75 plus costs in the amount of $760.17. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 9/22/2023. (mam)
GPO Dec 13 2023
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 138 Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Stay of Execution; denying 146 Defendant City Cycle Sales, Inc.'s Motion for Stay of Execution on Order for Fees and Costs. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 12/12/2023. (ca)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
170 170 appeal Mandate Wed 12/11 9:48 AM
APPEAL MANDATE from 10CCA: dismissing appeal. (Appeal No. 23-3214 (kmc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter