Original Case: 2:21-cv-02264

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-03214
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2023
Terminated:Dec 10, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 4:29 AM MST
Defendant - Appellant
CITY CYCLE SALES, INC.
Represented By
Cynthia J. Sheppeard
Goodell, Stratton, Edmonds & Palmer
contact info
Sarah Lynn Baltzell
Shook, Hardy & Bacon
contact info
Zach Chaffee-McClure
Shook, Hardy & Bacon
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JEREMY L. HARRIS
Represented By
Daniel Adam Kopp
Dickerson Oxton
contact info
Jeffrey D. Rowe
Dickerson Oxton
contact info
Thomas J. Dickerson
Dickerson Oxton
contact info

GPO Dec 10 2024
[11142891] Frap 42; Procedural termination without judicial action. [23-3214]

Docket last updated: 12/11/2024 4:29 AM MST
Monday, October 23, 2023
[11038400] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 10/23/2023 Docketing statement, transcript order form, notice of appearance and disclosure statement due 11/06/2023 for City Cycle Sales, Inc. Notice of appearance also due on 11/06/2023 for Jeremy L. Harris. 23-3214
Related: [-]
Att: 1 140 pgs Main Document
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil