California Northern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey S White
Referred: Kandis A Westmore
Case #: 4:21-cv-04519
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Jun 11, 2021
Terminated:Mar 31, 2023
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, Sonoma County, SCV-268348
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 08, 2021 1:18 AM PST
Defendant
United Services Automobile Association Federal Savings Bank
Represented By
Joshua Nathan Kastan
Dkm Law Group, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Joshua Maynard
740 Ely Blvd S
Petaluma, CA 94954

GPO Nov 02 2021
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 11/10/2021. Responses to 31 Motion to Quash due by 11/10/2021. Replies due by 11/17/2021. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/2/2021. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2021)
GPO Sep 09 2022
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION Re: Dkt. Nos., 59, 60, 61, 62, 63, 64, 65 Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 9, 2022. (dts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
GPO Mar 31 2023
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 70 Motion for Summary Judgment. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2023)
GPO May 02 2023
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ALTER JUDGMENT by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying 87 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 88 Motion to Alter Judgment. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2023)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
99 99 appeal USCA Memorandum Mon 04/14 3:33 PM
USCA Memorandum as to89 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Joshua Maynard (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]