Original Case: 4:21-cv-04519

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-15566
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2023
Terminated:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 5:48 AM PDT
Defendant-counter-claimant - Appellee
USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK
Represented By
Joshua Nathan Kastan
DKM Law Group, LLP
contact info
Joshua F. Gonzales
DKM Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff-counter-defendant - Appellant
JOSHUA MAYNARD
Represented By
Joshua Maynard
contact info
Plaintiff-counter-defendant - Appellant
JOSHUA C. MAYNARD
Represented By
Joshua C. Maynard
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/17/2025 5:47 AM PDT
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Joshua Maynard opening brief due 06/15/2023. Appellee USAA Federal Savings Bank answering brief due 07/17/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12697996] (JBS) [Entered: 04/18/2023 03:08 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 56 pgs Pro Se Case Opening Packet