West Virginia Northern District Court
Judge:Frederick P Stamp, Jr
Referred: John S Kaull
Case #: 1:14-cv-00122
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2014
Terminated:Sep 24, 2015
Last checked: Saturday May 09, 2015 7:45 PM EDT
Defendant
Fairmont Supply Company
Represented By
Larry J. Rector
Steptoe & Johnson Pllc - Bridgeport
contact info
Denielle-Jacqueline Marie Stritch
Steptoe & Johnson Pllc - Bridgeport
contact info
Plaintiff
Cacie Biddle
Represented By
Stephen P. New
The Law Office Of Stephen P. New
contact info
Amanda J. Taylor
The Law Office Of Stephen P. New
contact info
Amanda J. Gardner
The Law Office Of Stephen P. New
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Consol Energy Inc.
Terminated: 08/13/2014
Represented By
Larry J. Rector
Steptoe & Johnson Pllc - Bridgeport
contact info
Denielle-Jacqueline Marie Stritch
Steptoe & Johnson Pllc - Bridgeport
contact info

GPO Sep 24 2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING AS MOOT PARTIES' MOTIONS IN LIMINE. The Court grants the Defendant's 80 Motion for Summary Judgment and denies as moot the following motions in limine: Dkt Nos. 91 92 93 94 95 96 97 98 99 100 101 and 102. It is further ORDERED that this civil action be DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the active docket of this Court. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58, the Clerk is directed to enter judgment in this matter. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 9/24/15. (mh)

Docket last updated: 01/27/2015 2:29 AM EST
Thursday, July 17, 2014
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Marion County Circuit Court, (case number 14-C-178), filed by Consol Energy, Inc., Fairmont Supply Company.(kd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Elizabeth Duggan,
Att: 3 Proof of Service,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNC001063 (kd)
Related: [-]
3 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Consol Energy, Inc., Fairmont Supply Company Related [+]
Related: [-] ctor, Larry
4 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fairmont Supply Company identifying Corporate Parent Consol Energy Inc. for Fairmont Supply Company.. Related [+]
Related: [-] ctor, Larry
5 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Consol Energy Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] ctor, Larry