Original Case: 1:14-cv-00122

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:15-cv.pr-02175
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2015
Terminated:May 19, 2016
Last checked: Friday May 20, 2016 7:01 AM EDT
Defendant
CONSOL ENERGY, INCORPORATED, a foreign corporation
Defendant - Appellee
FAIRMONT SUPPLY COMPANY, a foreign corporation
Represented By
Larry Joseph Rector
STEPTOE & JOHNSON, PLLC
contact info
Denielle-Jacqueline Marie Stritch
STEPTOE & JOHNSON, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
CACIE BIDDLE
Represented By
Amanda J. Taylor
LAW OFFICE OF STEPHEN P. NEW
contact info

GPO May 19 2016
UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Originating case number: 1:14-cv-00122-FPS-JSK. Copies to all parties and the district court. [999827384]. [15-2175]

Docket last updated: 05/20/2016 6:52 AM EDT
Friday, October 02, 2015
1 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:14-cv-00122-FPS-JSK. Case manager: JRice. 15-2175 (JR)
Related: [-]
2 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:14-cv-00122-FPS-JSK. Mailed to: Stephen Paul New, Amanda Jo Taylor. 15-2175 (JR)
Related: [-]