District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Randolph D Moss
Case #: 1:21-cv-01606
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause05:0701 Judicial Review of Agency Decision
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2021
Re-opened:Oct 10, 2023
Terminated:Mar 07, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Dec 11, 2021 3:51 AM EST
Defendant
DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Represented By
Joseph Evan Borson
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
MARITIME ADMINISTRATION
Represented By
Joseph Evan Borson
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Movant
APL MARITIME, LTD.
Represented By
Brian T Burgess
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Gerard Justin Cedrone
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC.
Represented By
Mark Andrew Perry
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
contact info
Joshua M. Wesneski
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
contact info

GPO Aug 04 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION: For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum Opinion, the Court will GRANT Defendants' motions to dismiss, Dkt. 15; Dkt. 17, and DISMISS the case for lack of jurisdiction. A separate order will issue. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/04/2022. (lcrdm1)
GPO Mar 07 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION: For the reasons contained herein, the Court will DENY Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, Dkt. 35, GRANT Defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment, Dkt. 37, and GRANT Defendant-Intervenor's cross-motion for summary judgment, Dkt. 38. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/7/2025. (lcrdm2)

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
61 61 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Tue 05/06 1:20 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid re60 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,,. (zjm)
Related: [-]
60 60 appeal Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Tue 05/06 12:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to59 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, , , , ,58 Memorandum & Opinion, as to (59 in 1:21-cv-01606-RDM, 59 in 1:21-cv-01606-RDM, 59 in 1:21-cv-01606-RDM) Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,, by MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC.. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number DCDC-11669973. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01606-RDM, 1:22-cv-01975-RDM(Townsend, Lucas) Modified on 5/6/2025 to add docket link(zjm)
Related: [-]
appeal USCA Case Number Tue 05/06 8:27 PM
USCA Case Number 25-5162 for60 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,, filed by MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC.. (zjm)
Related: [-]