Original Case: 1:21-cv-01606

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cvus-05212
Typecivil us / united states
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Aug 10, 2022
Terminated:Aug 15, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 16, 2023 4:46 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
United States Department of Transportation
Represented By
Casen Ross
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Paul Maitland Geier
U.S. Department of Transportation
contact info
Brian Matthew Boynton
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Charles Wylie Scarborough
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Joy Park
U.S. Department of Transportation
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Maritime Administration
Represented By
Casen Ross
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Paul Maitland Geier
U.S. Department of Transportation
contact info
Brian Matthew Boynton
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Charles Wylie Scarborough
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Joy Park
U.S. Department of Transportation
contact info
Intervenor for Defendant - Appellee
APL Maritime, Ltd.
Represented By
Brian Timothy Burgess
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Paul Maitland Geier
U.S. Department of Transportation
contact info
Brian Matthew Boynton
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Gerard Justin Cedrone
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Joy Park
U.S. Department of Transportation
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Matson Navigation Company, Inc.
Represented By
Rachel Susan Brass
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Joshua M. Wesneski
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Lucas Cody Townsend
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Amalia Reiss
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info

GPO Aug 15 2023
OPINION [2012537] filed (Pages: 14) for the Court by Judge Rao. [21-1137, 22-1150, 22-5212, 22-5224]

Docket last updated: 08/16/2023 4:46 AM EDT
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 22-5212
Related: [-]
21 pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [1958736] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:21-cv-01606-RDM filed by Matson Navigation Company, Inc.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-5212 22-5212
Related: [-]
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [1958741] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 09/09/2022. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 09/09/2022. APPELLANT statement of issues due 09/09/2022. APPELLANT underlying decision due 09/09/2022. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 09/09/2022. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 09/09/2022. APPELLANT transcript status report due 09/09/2022. APPELLANT procedural motions due 09/09/2022. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 09/26/2022; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 09/09/2022. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 09/09/2022. APPELLEE procedural motions due 09/09/2022. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 09/26/2022 22-5212
Related: [-]