Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Jane M Beckering
Referred: Phillip J Green
Case #: 1:21-cv-00500
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2021
Terminated:May 13, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 11, 2021 4:09 AM EST
defendant
Joseph Abram
Represented By
Chloe Cunningham
Varnum LLP
contact info
Kyle Patrick Konwinski
Varnum Riddering Schmidt & Howlett Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
defendant
Kent, County of
Represented By
Chloe Cunningham
Varnum LLP
contact info
Kyle Patrick Konwinski
Varnum Riddering Schmidt & Howlett Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
defendant
Braxton Crowder
Represented By
Kyle Patrick Konwinski
Varnum Riddering Schmidt & Howlett Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
defendant
Stephen Dumond
defendant
Alex Fox
Represented By
Kyle Patrick Konwinski
Varnum Riddering Schmidt & Howlett Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
defendant
Unknown Hansen
Represented By
Kyle Patrick Konwinski
Varnum Riddering Schmidt & Howlett Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
defendant
Jason Kelley
Represented By
Kyle Patrick Konwinski
Varnum Riddering Schmidt & Howlett Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
defendant
Jason Mervau
Represented By
Kyle Patrick Konwinski
Varnum Riddering Schmidt & Howlett Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
defendant
Denny Pittman
Represented By
Allan C. Vander Laan
Cummings Mcclorey Davis & Acho Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
Kristen Lee Rewa
Cummings Mcclorey Davis & Acho Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
plaintiff
Kim Hodges
Represented By
Solomon M. Radner
Johnson Law Plc (detroit)
contact info
Madeline M. Sinkovich
Johnson Law Plc (detroit)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
defendant
Unknown Part(y)(ies)
Terminated: 11/18/2021


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, February 28, 2025
164 164 appeal Transmission Form Tue 03/04 11:12 AM
TRANSMISSION FORM RETURNED re appeal147 (jjm) Modified text on 3/4/2025 (jjm)
Related: [-]