Original Case: 1:21-cv-00500

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-01292
Typecivil / private / civil rights
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 3:15 AM CDT
Defendant
JOSEPH ABRAM
Defendant - Appellant
STEPHEN DUMOND, Detective
Represented By
Christopher Patrick Desmond
Johnson Law Firm
contact info
Charles L. Bogren
Plunkett Cooney
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
KIM HODGES, personal representative for the estate of Michael Donte Molson
Represented By
Christopher Patrick Desmond
Johnson Law Firm
contact info
Aristidi Demetrios Papaioannou
Johnson Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/09/2024 3:15 AM CDT
Monday, April 08, 2024
The case manager for this case is: Sharday Swain (SSS)
Related: [-]
3 pgs Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Stephen Dumond. Transcript needed: y. (SSS)
Related: [-]
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Kim Hodges by Christopher P. Desmond. Certificate of Service: 04/08/2024. 24-1292 (CPD)
Related: [-]