South Carolina District Court
Judge:Jacquelyn D Austin
Referred: Kevin Mcdonald
Case #: 7:21-cv-01782
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2021
Terminated:May 07, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 11, 2021 4:50 AM EST
Defendant
GES Recycling South Carolina LLC
Represented By
Matthew J Gilley
Ford And Harrison LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Eddie Stewart
Represented By
Geraldine Sumter
Ferguson Stein Wallas Adkins Gresham And Sumter
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, June 06, 2024
73 73 appeal Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA Thu 06/06 4:46 PM
Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA re72 Notice of Appeal, The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (jens)
Related: [-]
72 72 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 06/06 3:22 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to70 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Report and Recommendation,71 Summary Judgment by Eddie Stewart. - Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ASCDC-11810391. The Docketing Statement form, Transcript Order form and CJA 24 form may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov (Sumter, Geraldine)
Related: [-]