Original Case: 7:21-cv-01782

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv.pr-01523
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jun 10, 2024 4:18 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
GES RECYCLING SOUTH CAROLINA LLC
Represented By
Brianna Lynn Schill
FORD & HARRISON LLP
contact info
Benjamin Paul Fryer
FORD & HARRISON LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
EDDIE STEWART
Represented By
Geraldine Sumter
FERGUSON CHAMBER & SUMTER, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/10/2024 4:15 AM EDT
Friday, June 07, 2024
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 7:21-cv-01782-JDA. Case manager: GAboutabl. [1001581384] 24-1523 GMA [Entered: 06/07/2024 11:51 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 6 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 7:21-cv-01782-JDA. Mailed to: Brianna Lynn Schill. [1001581388] 24-1523 GMA [Entered: 06/07/2024 11:55 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Brianna Lynn Schill. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. All filings must comply with Appendix Pagination & Brief Citation Guide. [1001581393] Opening brief and appendix due 07/17/2024. Response Brief due 08/16/2024. 24-1523 GMA [Entered: 06/07/2024 12:00 PM]
Related: [-]