Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11466

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:21-ap-50765
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2021
Terminated:Nov 19, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
CCJ Physics LLC
1823 Fort Washington Ave.
Maple Glen, PA 19002
Represented By
CCJ Physics LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Center City Healthcare, LLC
230 North Broad Street
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
20 20 misc Status Report Tue 01/24 10:38 AM
Status Report Fifth Interim Status Report of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
19 19 misc Status Report Tue 09/27 8:14 AM
Status Report Fourth Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
18 18 misc Status Report Tue 06/14 3:25 PM
Status Report Third Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
17 17 misc Status Report Wed 02/23 8:48 AM
Status Report Second Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 19, 2021
16 16 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Fri 11/19 5:18 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Order Approving Settlement of Preference Claims Against CCJ Physics LLC Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 [Adv. Docket No. 14] . Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 14
15 15 notice Dismissal - Notice Fri 11/19 10:35 AM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 11/19 1:46 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-50765 Closed (MB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 18, 2021
14 14 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Thu 11/18 3:27 PM
Order Approving Settlement of Preference Claims Against CCJ Physics LLC Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Related [+] Signed on 11/18/2021. (LMC)
Related: [-] 11 ,13
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
13 13 misc Certificate of No Objection(Adv) Wed 11/17 4:05 PM
Certificate of No Objection to Motion of Debtors for Approval of Settlement of Preference Claims Against CCJ Physics LLC Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC. (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-] 11
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Monday, November 08, 2021
12 12 misc Status Report Mon 11/08 2:51 PM
Status Report Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 02, 2021
11 11 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion Tue 11/02 9:05 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 for Approval of Settlement of Preference Claims against CCJ Physics LLC Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 12/21/2021 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/16/2021. (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 09/22 5:42 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Hearing scheduled for 9/23/2021 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Related [+] (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-] 2846
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
9 9 17 pgs order Order Tue 09/21 2:33 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Signed on 9/21/2021 (LMC)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 09/21 12:05 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Hearing scheduled for 9/23/2021 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
7 7 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Mon 09/20 6:19 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Debtors' Motion for Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
6 6 misc Exhibit Tue 09/07 12:23 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice of Filing of Exhibit D to Motion for Entry of an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] 5
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Avoidance Actions
Att: 2 Exhibit B - List of Proposed Mediators
Thursday, September 02, 2021
5 5 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Thu 09/02 1:14 PM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Objections due by 9/16/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 07/27 7:51 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 07/27 7:50 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant CCJ Physics LLC. Related [+] Tickle due by: 9/27/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] ument1
Wednesday, June 23, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 06/23 3:15 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-50765 MFW] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10380089, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 06/23 7:37 AM
Adversary case 21-50765 Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 & 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502(d) by Center City Healthcare, LLC d/b/a Hahnemann University Hospital against CCJ Physics LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). AP Summons Served due date: 9/21/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives