Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11466

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:21-ap-50796
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2021
Terminated:Oct 24, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
McKesson Plasma & Biologics LLC
6535 State Highway, 161
Irving, TX 75039
Represented By
McKesson Plasma & Biologics LLC
contact info
Defendant
McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
9954 Maryland Drive Suite 4000
Richmond, VA 23233
Represented By
McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Center City Healthcare, LLC
230 North Broad Street
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC
216 North Broad Street 4th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TPS III of PA, L.L.C.
216 North Broad Street 4th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TPS IV of PA, L.L.C.
216 North Broad Street 4th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TPS V of PA, L.L.C.
216 North Broad Street 4th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info

GPO Jun 13 2022
Memorandum Opinion GRANTING the Motion to Dismiss with respect to Count II and DENYING the Motion to Dismiss with respect to Counts I, III, and IV. (related document(s)1, 18, 21, 25) Signed on July 13, 2022 (CAF)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, October 24, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Thu 10/24 7:02 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-50796 Closed (LAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
77 77 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 10/21 11:27 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., McKesson Plasma & Biologics LLC, St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-]