Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11466

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:21-ap-50903
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2021
Terminated:Aug 16, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Keystone Quality Transport Inc.
1260 E. Woodland Avenue Suite 200
Springfield, PA 19064
Represented By
Keystone Quality Transport Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Center City Healthcare, LLC
216 North Broad Street 4th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 86 minutes ago
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
35 35 misc Status Report Tue 01/24 10:38 AM
Status Report Fifth Interim Status Report of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
34 34 misc Status Report Tue 09/27 8:21 AM
Status Report Fourth Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
33 33 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Thu 08/18 5:29 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Order Approving Settlement of Preference Claims Against Keystone Quality Transport Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 [Adv. Docket No. 31] . Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 31
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Tue 08/16 9:03 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-50903 Closed (LAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2022
32 32 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 08/15 12:57 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal related document(s)1 Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Keystone Quality Transport Inc.. (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
31 31 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Fri 08/12 4:17 PM
Order Approving Settlement of Preference Claims Against Keystone Quality Transport Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Related [+] Signed on 8/12/2022. (CAF)
Related: [-] 29
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement
Thursday, August 11, 2022
30 30 misc Certificate of No Objection(Adv) Thu 08/11 5:08 PM
Certificate of No Objection to Motion of Debtors for Approval of Settlement of Preference Claims Against Keystone Quality Transport Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 901 Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC. (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-] 29
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
29 29 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion Wed 07/27 2:41 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 for Approval of Settlement of Preference Claims against Keystone Quality Transport Inc. Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 8/23/2022 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 8/10/2022. (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
28 28 misc Letter (Adv) Tue 06/28 4:26 PM
Letter to the Honorable Judge Walrath reporting settlement of Adversary Proceedings Related [+] Filed by Keystone Quality Transport Inc.. (Carbino, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 9
Monday, June 27, 2022
27 27 motion Stipulation Mon 06/27 2:36 PM
Stipulation Second Stipulation Extending Pre-Trial Dates and Deadlines Between Center City Healthcare, LLC, Keystone Quality Transport Inc. and . Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Keystone Quality Transport Inc.. (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Letter (Adv) Mon 06/27 2:30 PM
Letter to the Honorable Judge Walrath re scheduling depositions Related [+] Filed by Keystone Quality Transport Inc.. (Carbino, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 9
Friday, June 17, 2022
25 25 notice Deposition - Notice Fri 06/17 2:52 PM
Notice of Deposition of Justin Misner Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
24 24 notice Deposition - Notice Fri 06/17 2:52 PM
Notice of Deposition of Todd Strine Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
23 23 notice Deposition - Notice Fri 06/17 2:51 PM
Notice of Deposition of Keystone Quality Transport, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
22 22 misc Status Report Tue 06/14 3:25 PM
Status Report Third Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2022
21 21 motion Stipulation Thu 05/19 11:25 AM
Stipulation Extending Pre-Trial Dates and Deadlines Between Center City Healthcare, LLC, Keystone Quality Transport Inc. and . Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Keystone Quality Transport Inc.. (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
20 20 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Fri 05/13 4:28 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery of Plaintiffs' Responses and Objections to Keystone Quality Transport, Inc.'s First Request for the Production of Documents, Interrogatories and Requests for Admission Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, March 11, 2022
19 19 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Fri 03/11 9:55 AM
Notice of Service of Discovery of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents and Requests to Admit Directed to Defendant Keystone Quality Transport Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
18 18 misc Status Report Wed 02/23 8:48 AM
Status Report Second Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 18, 2022
17 17 misc Initial Disclosures Fri 02/18 4:26 PM
Initial Disclosures Filed by Keystone Quality Transport Inc.. (Carbino, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
16 16 misc Initial Disclosures Tue 02/15 4:21 PM
Initial Disclosures Plaintiff's Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
15 15 mediation Mediator's Certificate of Completion Wed 01/19 6:08 PM
Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Berkoff, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 24, 2021
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/25 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 11/24/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13
Monday, November 22, 2021
13 13 court VAN-486 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order) Mon 11/22 2:42 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Leslie A. Berkoff is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Mediation Report due by 5/23/2022. Signed on 11/22/2021. (MB)
Related: [-] 12
12 12 notice Selection of Mediator - Notice Mon 11/22 11:29 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 08, 2021
11 11 misc Status Report Mon 11/08 2:51 PM
Status Report Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 09/22 5:42 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Hearing scheduled for 9/23/2021 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Related [+] (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-] 2846
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
9 9 17 pgs order Order Tue 09/21 2:38 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Signed on 9/21/2021 (LMC)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 09/21 12:05 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Hearing scheduled for 9/23/2021 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
7 7 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Mon 09/20 6:19 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Debtors' Motion for Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
6 6 misc Exhibit Tue 09/07 1:17 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice of Filing of Exhibit D to Motion for Entry of an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] 5
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Avoidance Actions
Att: 2 Exhibit B - List of Proposed Mediators
Thursday, September 02, 2021
5 5 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Thu 09/02 1:14 PM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Objections due by 9/16/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 08, 2021
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Thu 07/08 6:07 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Keystone Quality Transport Inc.. (Carbino, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 3
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/06 2:05 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Keystone Quality Transport Inc. Mediation due date: 11/3/2021. (Carbino, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, June 24, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 06/24 3:50 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-50903 MFW] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10382041, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 06/24 1:07 PM
Adversary case 21-50903 Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 & 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502(d) by Center City Healthcare, LLC against Keystone Quality Transport Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 9/22/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives