Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11466

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:21-ap-50915
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2021
Terminated:Mar 22, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Echo Inc.
209 10th Ave S Suite 450
Nashville, TN 37203
Represented By
Echo Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Center City Healthcare, LLC
216 North Broad Street 4th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC
21 North Broad Street 4th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
26 26 misc Status Report Tue 01/24 10:47 AM
Status Report Fifth Interim Status Report of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
25 25 misc Status Report Tue 09/27 8:21 AM
Status Report Fourth Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
24 24 misc Status Report Tue 06/14 3:27 PM
Status Report Third Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
23 23 notice Dismissal - Notice Tue 03/22 9:48 AM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 03/22 12:07 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-50915 Closed (MB)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2022
22 22 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Mon 03/21 11:59 AM
Order Approving Settlement of Preference Claims Against Echo Inc. (n/k/a Veritystream, Inc.) and Healthstream, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Related [+] Signed on 3/21/2022. (LMC)
Related: [-] 20 ,21
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement
Friday, March 18, 2022
21 21 misc Certificate of No Objection(Adv) Fri 03/18 4:16 PM
Certificate of No Objection to Motion of Debtors For Approval of Settlement of Preference Claims Against Echo Inc. (N/K/A Veritystream, Inc.) and Healthstream, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC. (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-] 20
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Thursday, March 03, 2022
20 20 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion Thu 03/03 8:12 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 for Approval of Settlement of Preference Claims against Echo Inc. (n/k/a Veritystream, Inc.) and Healthstream, Inc. Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/19/2022 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 3/17/2022. (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
19 19 misc Status Report Wed 02/23 8:54 AM
Status Report Second Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 24, 2021
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/25 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 11/24/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16
Monday, November 22, 2021
17 17 mediation Conflict Review Mon 11/22 3:58 PM
Conflict Review Pursuant to Local Rule 9019-2(e)(iii)(B) (Kenney, Mark)
Related: [-]
16 16 court VAN-486 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order) Mon 11/22 3:03 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Mark S. Kenney is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Mediation Report due by 5/23/2022. Signed on 11/22/2021. (MB)
Related: [-] 15
15 15 notice Selection of Mediator - Notice Mon 11/22 11:44 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 08, 2021
14 14 misc Status Report Mon 11/08 3:32 PM
Status Report Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/22 9:36 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] 11 ,12
12 12 cmp Alias Summons Fri 10/22 9:34 AM
Alias Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Echo Inc.. Related [+] (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/22 9:31 AM
Amended Complaint to Modify Party Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC Related [+] AP Summons Served due date: 1/20/2022. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 09/22 5:42 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Hearing scheduled for 9/23/2021 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Related [+] (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-] 2846
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
9 9 17 pgs order Order Tue 09/21 2:38 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Signed on 9/21/2021 (LMC)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 09/21 12:05 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Hearing scheduled for 9/23/2021 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
7 7 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Mon 09/20 6:19 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Debtors' Motion for Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
6 6 misc Exhibit Tue 09/07 1:33 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice of Filing of Exhibit D to Motion for Entry of an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] 5
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Avoidance Actions
Att: 2 Exhibit B - List of Proposed Mediators
Thursday, September 02, 2021
5 5 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Thu 09/02 1:14 PM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Objections due by 9/16/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 07/27 4:30 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 07/27 4:28 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Echo Inc.. Related [+] Tickle due by: 9/27/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] ument1
Saturday, June 26, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Sat 06/26 1:04 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-50915 MFW] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10384021, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 25, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 06/25 7:44 AM
Adversary case 21-50915 Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 & 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502(d) by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC against Echo Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 9/23/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives