Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11466

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:21-ap-50918
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2021
Terminated:Jan 13, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Healthstream, Inc.
500 11th Avenue North Suite 1000
Nashville, TN 37203
Represented By
Healthstream, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC
216 North Broad Street 4th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
27 27 misc Status Report Tue 01/24 10:47 AM
Status Report Fifth Interim Status Report of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
26 26 misc Status Report Tue 09/27 8:21 AM
Status Report Fourth Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
25 25 misc Status Report Tue 06/14 3:27 PM
Status Report Third Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
24 24 notice Satisfaction of Judgment Tue 03/22 12:44 PM
Satisfaction of Judgment Related [+] Filed by Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-] 14 ,18
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, March 21, 2022
23 23 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Mon 03/21 12:00 PM
Order Approving Settlement of Preference Claims Against Echo Inc. (n/k/a Veritystream, Inc.) and Healthstream, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Related [+] Signed on 3/21/2022. (LMC)
Related: [-] 21 ,22
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement
Friday, March 18, 2022
22 22 misc Certificate of No Objection(Adv) Fri 03/18 4:16 PM
Certificate of No Objection to Motion of Debtors For Approval of Settlement of Preference Claims Against Echo Inc. (N/K/A Veritystream, Inc.) and Healthstream, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Related [+] Filed by Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC. (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-] 21
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Thursday, March 03, 2022
21 21 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion Thu 03/03 8:13 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 for Approval of Settlement of Preference Claims against Echo Inc. (n/k/a Veritystream, Inc.) and Healthstream, Inc. Filed by Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/19/2022 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 3/17/2022. (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
20 20 misc Status Report Wed 02/23 8:54 AM
Status Report Second Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 13, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Thu 01/13 7:52 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-50918 Closed (LAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 01/06 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 01/05/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18
Monday, January 03, 2022
18 18 court VAN-433a Default Judgment - WITH Interest Mon 01/03 4:13 PM
Default Judgment against Healthstream, Inc. Related [+] Tickle due by: 1/18/2022. Signed on 1/3/2022. (MB)
Related: [-] 13
Friday, December 31, 2021
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/01 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/31/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/01 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/31/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
15 15 court VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest Wed 12/29 4:06 PM
Default Judgment Against Healthstream, Inc. Related [+] Signed on 12/29/2021. (DMC)
Related: [-] 13
14 14 court VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 12/29 4:04 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Healthstream, Inc. Related [+] Signed on 12/29/2021. (DMC)
Related: [-] 12
Monday, December 27, 2021
13 13 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Mon 12/27 10:41 AM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] 1 1
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Demmy Declaration
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Judgment by Default
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
12 12 motion Request for Entry of Default - Failure to Defend (Adv) Tue 11/09 3:20 PM
Request for Entry of Default- Failure to Defend (Notice of Default) Filed by Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, November 08, 2021
11 11 misc Status Report Mon 11/08 3:32 PM
Status Report Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 09/22 5:42 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Hearing scheduled for 9/23/2021 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Related [+] (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-] 2846
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
9 9 17 pgs order Order Tue 09/21 2:38 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Signed on 9/21/2021 (LMC)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 09/21 12:05 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Hearing scheduled for 9/23/2021 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
7 7 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Mon 09/20 6:19 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Debtors' Motion for Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
6 6 misc Exhibit Tue 09/07 1:40 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice of Filing of Exhibit D to Motion for Entry of an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Related [+] Filed by Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] 5
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Avoidance Actions
Att: 2 Exhibit B - List of Proposed Mediators
Thursday, September 02, 2021
5 5 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Thu 09/02 1:14 PM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Objections due by 9/16/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/28 8:09 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 07/28 8:07 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Healthstream, Inc.. Related [+] Tickle due by: 9/27/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] ument1
Saturday, June 26, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Sat 06/26 1:04 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-50918 MFW] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10384021, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 25, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 06/25 8:06 AM
Adversary case 21-50918 Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 & 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502(d) by Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC against Healthstream, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 9/23/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives