Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11466

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:21-ap-50931
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2021
Terminated:Jan 12, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Quantros Inc.
55 Beattie Place Suite 1600
Greenville, SC 29601
Represented By
Quantros Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Center City Healthcare, LLC
216 North Broad Street 4th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC
216 North Broad Street 4th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
26 26 misc Status Report Tue 01/24 10:47 AM
Status Report Fifth Interim Status Report of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
25 25 misc Status Report Tue 09/27 8:21 AM
Status Report Fourth Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
24 24 misc Status Report Tue 06/14 3:29 PM
Status Report Third Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
23 23 notice Dismissal - Notice Tue 04/26 12:09 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Satisfaction of Judgment Tue 04/26 9:55 AM
Satisfaction of Judgment Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-] 14 ,15
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, April 18, 2022
21 21 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Mon 04/18 11:42 AM
Order Approving Settlement of Preference Claims Against Quantros Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Related [+] Signed on 4/18/2022. (LMC)
Related: [-] 19 ,20
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement
Thursday, April 14, 2022
20 20 misc Certificate of No Objection(Adv) Thu 04/14 4:20 PM
Certificate of No Objection to Motion of Debtors for Approval of Settlement of Preference Claims Against Quantros Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC. (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-] 19
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
19 19 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion Wed 03/30 11:29 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 for Approval of Settlement of Preference Claims against Quantros Inc. Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 5/18/2022 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 4/13/2022. (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
18 18 misc Status Report Wed 02/23 8:54 AM
Status Report Second Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Wed 01/12 9:02 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-50931 Closed (LAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 30, 2021
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 12/31 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/30/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 12/31 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/30/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
Tuesday, December 28, 2021
15 15 court VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest Tue 12/28 3:46 PM
Default Judgment against Quantros Inc. Related [+] Tickle due by: 1/11/2022. Signed on 12/28/2021. (MB)
Related: [-] 13
14 14 court VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 12/28 3:44 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Quantros Inc. Related [+] Signed on 12/28/2021. (MB)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, December 23, 2021
13 13 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Thu 12/23 2:07 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] 1 1
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Demmy Declaration
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Judgment by Default
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
12 12 motion Request for Entry of Default - Failure to Defend (Adv) Tue 11/09 3:45 PM
Request for Entry of Default- Failure to Defend (Notice of Default) Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, November 08, 2021
11 11 misc Status Report Mon 11/08 3:32 PM
Status Report Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 09/22 5:49 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Hearing scheduled for 9/23/2021 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
9 9 17 pgs order Order Tue 09/21 2:38 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Signed on 9/21/2021 (LMC)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 09/21 12:14 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Hearing scheduled for 9/23/2021 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
7 7 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Mon 09/20 6:37 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Debtors' Motion for Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
6 6 misc Exhibit Tue 09/07 3:28 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice of Filing of Exhibit D to Motion for Entry of an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] 5
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Avoidance Actions
Att: 2 Exhibit B - List of Proposed Mediators
Thursday, September 02, 2021
5 5 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Thu 09/02 1:26 PM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Objections due by 9/16/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 30, 2021
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Fri 07/30 8:34 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 07/30 8:33 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Quantros Inc.. Related [+] Tickle due by: 9/28/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] ument1
Saturday, June 26, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Sat 06/26 1:04 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-50931 MFW] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10384021, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 25, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 06/25 6:59 PM
Adversary case 21-50931 Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 & 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502(d) by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC against Quantros Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 9/23/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives