Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11466

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:21-ap-50947
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2021
Terminated:Jul 13, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
VDM, LP
326 West Lancaster Avenue Suite 110
Ardmore, PA 19003
Represented By
VDM, LP
contact info
Plaintiff
Center City Healthcare, LLC
216 North Broad Street 4th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C.
216 North Broad Street 4th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
5 5 misc Status Report Tue 09/27 8:41 AM
Status Report Fourth Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 08, 2021
4 4 misc Status Report Mon 11/08 3:32 PM
Status Report Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 13, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Tue 07/13 3:12 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-50947 Closed (MB)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 12, 2021
3 3 notice Dismissal - Notice Mon 07/12 4:41 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C. (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 27, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Sun 06/27 12:22 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-50947 MFW] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10384179, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 26, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Sat 06/26 6:31 PM
Adversary case 21-50947 Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 & 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502(d) by Center City Healthcare, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C. against VDM, LP. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 9/24/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives