Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11466

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:21-ap-50956
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2021
Terminated:Jan 12, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Tele-Physicians, P.C.
1768 Business Center Drive Suite 100
Reston, VA 20190
Represented By
Tele-Physicians, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Center City Healthcare, LLC
216 North Broad Street 4th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC
216 North Broad Street 4th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
23 23 misc Status Report Tue 01/24 10:53 AM
Status Report Fifth Interim Status Report of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
22 22 misc Status Report Tue 09/27 8:41 AM
Status Report Fourth Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
21 21 misc Status Report Tue 06/14 3:29 PM
Status Report Third Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
20 20 misc Status Report Wed 02/23 9:05 AM
Status Report Second Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Wed 01/12 9:10 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-50956 Closed (LAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/08 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 01/07/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
18 18 court VAN-433a Default Judgment - WITH Interest Wed 01/05 12:20 PM
Default Judgment against Tele-Physicians, P.C. Related [+] Tickle due by: 1/19/2022. Signed on 1/5/2022. (MB)
Related: [-] 13
Thursday, December 30, 2021
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 12/31 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/30/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 12/31 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/30/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
Tuesday, December 28, 2021
15 15 court VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest Tue 12/28 3:18 PM
Default Judgment against Tele-Physicians, P.C. Related [+] Tickle due by: 1/11/2022. Signed on 12/28/2021. (MB)
Related: [-] 13
14 14 court VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 12/28 3:16 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against defendant Tele-Physicians, P.C. Related [+] Signed on 12/28/2021. (MB)
Related: [-] 13
Thursday, December 23, 2021
13 13 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Thu 12/23 11:50 AM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] 1 1
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Demmy Declaration
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Judgment by Default
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
12 12 motion Request for Entry of Default - Failure to Defend (Adv) Tue 11/09 3:59 PM
Request for Entry of Default- Failure to Defend (Notice of Default) Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, November 08, 2021
11 11 misc Status Report Mon 11/08 3:32 PM
Status Report Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 09/22 5:49 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Hearing scheduled for 9/23/2021 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
9 9 17 pgs order Order Tue 09/21 2:53 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Signed on 9/21/2021 (LMC)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 09/21 12:14 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Hearing scheduled for 9/23/2021 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
7 7 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Mon 09/20 6:37 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Debtors' Motion for Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
6 6 misc Exhibit Tue 09/07 5:10 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice of Filing of Exhibit D to Motion for Entry of an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] 5
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Avoidance Actions
Att: 2 Exhibit B - List of Proposed Mediators
Thursday, September 02, 2021
5 5 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Thu 09/02 1:26 PM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Objections due by 9/16/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 30, 2021
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Fri 07/30 1:55 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 07/30 1:54 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Tele-Physicians, P.C.. Related [+] Tickle due by: 9/28/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] ument1
Monday, June 28, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 06/28 7:46 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-50956 MFW] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10384379, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 27, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Sun 06/27 1:43 PM
Adversary case 21-50956 Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 & 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502(d) by Center City Healthcare, LLC, St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC against Tele-Physicians, P.C.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 9/27/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives