Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11466

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:21-ap-50958
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2021
Terminated:Dec 14, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
WW Grainger Inc.
100 Grainger Pkwy
Lake Forest, IL 60045
Represented By
WW Grainger Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Center City Healthcare, LLC
216 North Broad Street 4th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC
216 North Broad Street 4th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C.
216 North Broad Street 4th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
20 20 misc Status Report Tue 01/24 10:53 AM
Status Report Fifth Interim Status Report of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
19 19 misc Status Report Tue 09/27 8:41 AM
Status Report Fourth Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
18 18 misc Status Report Tue 06/14 3:29 PM
Status Report Third Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
17 17 misc Status Report Wed 02/23 9:05 AM
Status Report Second Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Tue 12/14 4:24 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-50958 Closed (SJM)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
16 16 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 12/10 12:23 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal related document(s)1 Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, WW Grainger Inc.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 06, 2021
15 15 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Mon 12/06 12:47 PM
Order Approving Settlement of Preference Claims Against WW Grainger Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Related [+] Signed on 12/6/2021. (LMC)
Related: [-] 13 ,14
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement
Friday, December 03, 2021
14 14 misc Certificate of No Objection(Adv) Fri 12/03 4:19 PM
Certificate of No Objection to Motion of Debtors for Approval of Settlement of Preference Claims Against WW Grainger Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC. (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-] 13
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Thursday, November 18, 2021
13 13 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion Thu 11/18 11:14 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 for Approval of Settlement of Preference Claims against WW Grainger Inc. Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 12/21/2021 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/2/2021. (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Monday, November 08, 2021
12 12 misc Status Report Mon 11/08 3:36 PM
Status Report Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 14, 2021
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/14 3:16 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by WW Grainger Inc. Mediation due date: 02/11/2022. (Duedall, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 09/22 5:49 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Hearing scheduled for 9/23/2021 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
9 9 17 pgs order Order Tue 09/21 2:53 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Signed on 9/21/2021 (LMC)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 09/21 12:14 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Hearing scheduled for 9/23/2021 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
7 7 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Mon 09/20 6:37 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Debtors' Motion for Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
6 6 misc Exhibit Tue 09/07 5:13 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice of Filing of Exhibit D to Motion for Entry of an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] 5
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Avoidance Actions
Att: 2 Exhibit B - List of Proposed Mediators
Thursday, September 02, 2021
5 5 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Thu 09/02 1:26 PM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Objections due by 9/16/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 30, 2021
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Fri 07/30 2:19 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 07/30 2:18 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant WW Grainger Inc.. Related [+] Tickle due by: 9/28/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] ument1
Monday, June 28, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 06/28 7:46 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-50958 MFW] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10384379, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 27, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Sun 06/27 2:01 PM
Adversary case 21-50958 Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 & 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502(d) by Center City Healthcare, LLC, St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C. against WW Grainger Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 9/27/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives