Original Case: 1:21-cv-00067

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cv.co-01721
Typecivil copyright / private
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2021
Terminated:Feb 14, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 29, 2021 4:25 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
DMARCIAN EUROPE BV
Represented By
Samuel Batiste Hartzell
WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP
contact info
Pressly McAuley Millen
WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
DMARCIAN, INC.
Represented By
David Anthony Dorey
BLANK & ROME, LLP
contact info
Pamela Suzanne Duffy
SHARPLESS MCCLEARN LESTER DUFFY, PA
contact info

GPO Feb 14 2023
PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-00067-MR. [1001315913] [21-1721, 21-2005, 22-1728]

Docket last updated: 04/08/2024 9:50 AM EDT
Monday, June 28, 2021
1 1 1 pgs Civil copyright case docketed. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-00067-MR. Date notice of appeal filed: 06/28/2021. Case manager: REdwards. 21-1721 RE [Entered: 06/28/2021 03:59 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 Copyright notice transmitted. 21-1721 RE [Entered: 06/28/2021 04:07 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Copyright notice
Att: 2 1 pgs AO 121 form