North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Martin Reidinger
Case #: 1:21-cv-00067
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 08, 2021 4:54 AM EDT
Defendant
Dmarcian Europe BV
Represented By
Pressly M. Millen
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Samuel B. Hartzell
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dmarcian, Inc.
Represented By
Pamela S. Duffy
Sharpless Mcclearn Lester Duffy, PA
contact info
David A. Dorey
Blank Rome LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
461 461 misc Miscellaneous Filing Tue 05/13 12:04 PM
Transcript of Witness Examination of Hub Harmeling and Herwert Kalkman re:458 Exhibit (sc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Hub Harmeling Transcript,
Att: 2 Herwert Kalkman Transcript,
Att: 3 Envelope
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
460 460 2 pgs order Order Tue 05/06 2:47 PM
ORDER AMENDING 204 Protective Order to clarify that the protections conferred by the Protective Order extend to the video files of the examinations of Herwert Jente Kalkman and Hub Harmeling conducted in the Rechtbank Noord-Holland. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to provide copies of these examinations on a flash drive to the parties counsel of record, along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 5/6/2025. (hms)
Related: [-]
459 459 misc Sealed Document Tue 05/06 1:36 PM
Sealed Document ( Sealed - Attorney ): Fifth Notice of Filing of Financial Records by DMARC Advisor BV; (available to DMARC Advisor BV, Dmarcian, Inc.)(Hartzell, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Nineteenth Declaration of Martijn Groeneweg