Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11466

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:21-ap-50964
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2021
Terminated:Jan 21, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
David Keith Butler, Sr.
667 Misty Ridge Circle
Folsom, CA 95630
Represented By
David Keith Butler, Sr.
contact info
Plaintiff
Center City Healthcare, LLC
216 North Broad Street 4th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC
216 North Broad Street 4th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
25 25 misc Status Report Tue 01/24 10:53 AM
Status Report Fifth Interim Status Report of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
24 24 misc Status Report Tue 09/27 8:45 AM
Status Report Fourth Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
23 23 order Reopen Adversary Proceeding Mon 04/04 9:08 AM
Order Vacating Default Judgment Related [+] Signed on 4/4/2022. (LMC)
Related: [-] 21 ,22
Friday, April 01, 2022
22 22 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Fri 04/01 11:05 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Proposed Order Vacating Default Judgment and Resolving Motion of David Keith Butler to Re-Open Adversary Proceeding, Set Aside Defaults and Vacate Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC. (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-] 14 ,15 ,18 ,21
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Monday, March 07, 2022
21 21 motion Reopen Adversary Proceeding - Motion Mon 03/07 3:36 PM
Motion to Reopen Adversary Proceeding , Set Aside Defaults and Vacate Default Judgment . Related [+] Filed by David Keith Butler Sr.. Objections due by 3/28/2022. (Hauswirth, Gregory)
Related: [-] ument(s)12 ,13 ,15 ,18 18 ,15 ,13 ,12
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
20 20 misc Status Report Wed 02/23 9:05 AM
Status Report Second Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Fri 01/21 7:32 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-50964 Closed (LAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 01/06 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 01/05/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18
Monday, January 03, 2022
18 18 court VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 01/03 4:18 PM
AMENDED Clerk's Entry of Default against David Keith Butler, Sr. Related [+] Signed on 1/3/2022. (MB)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, December 30, 2021
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 12/31 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/30/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 12/31 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/30/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
Tuesday, December 28, 2021
15 15 court VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest Tue 12/28 4:12 PM
Default Judgment against Butler, Sr. Related [+] Tickle due by: 1/11/2022. Signed on 12/28/2021. (MB)
Related: [-] 13
14 14 court VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 12/28 4:10 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Butler, Sr. Related [+] Signed on 12/28/2021. (MB)
Related: [-] 12
Monday, December 27, 2021
13 13 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Mon 12/27 11:47 AM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] 1 1
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Demmy Declaration
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Judgment by Default
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
12 12 motion Request for Entry of Default - Failure to Defend (Adv) Tue 11/09 2:37 PM
Request for Entry of Default- Failure to Defend (Notice of Default) Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, November 08, 2021
11 11 misc Status Report Mon 11/08 3:36 PM
Status Report Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 09/22 5:49 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Hearing scheduled for 9/23/2021 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
9 9 17 pgs order Order Tue 09/21 2:53 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Signed on 9/21/2021 (LMC)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 09/21 12:14 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Hearing scheduled for 9/23/2021 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
7 7 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Mon 09/20 6:37 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Debtors' Motion for Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
6 6 misc Exhibit Tue 09/07 5:24 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice of Filing of Exhibit D to Motion for Entry of an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] 5
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Avoidance Actions
Att: 2 Exhibit B - List of Proposed Mediators
Thursday, September 02, 2021
5 5 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Thu 09/02 1:26 PM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Objections due by 9/16/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 26, 2021
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Mon 07/26 4:23 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Mon 07/26 4:22 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant David Keith Butler Sr.. Related [+] Tickle due by: 9/24/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] ument1
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 06/29 10:54 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-50964 MFW] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10386418, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 28, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Mon 06/28 2:37 PM
Adversary case 21-50964 Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 & 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502(d) by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC against David Keith Butler Sr.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 9/27/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives