Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11466

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:21-ap-50974
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2021
Terminated:Feb 11, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc.
325 Paramount Dr.
Raynham, MA 02767
Represented By
Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Center City Healthcare, LLC
216 North Broad Street 4th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
Sally E. Veghte
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
21 21 misc Status Report Wed 02/23 9:08 AM
Status Report Second Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 11, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Fri 02/11 8:58 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-50974 Closed (LAM)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 29, 2022
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 01/30 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 01/29/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16
Friday, January 28, 2022
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/29 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 01/28/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/29 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 01/28/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
Thursday, January 27, 2022
17 17 utility Corrective Entry Thu 01/27 8:56 AM
Corrective Entry - incorrect amount entered on docket #15 Related [+] (MB)
Related: [-] 15 ,16
16 16 court VAN-433a Default Judgment - WITH Interest Thu 01/27 8:55 AM
Default Judgment against Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc. Related [+] Tickle due by: 2/10/2022. Signed on 1/27/2022. (MB)
Related: [-] 12
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
15 15 court VAN-433a Default Judgment - WITH Interest Wed 01/26 2:58 PM
[ENTERED IN ERROR] Default Judgment against Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc. Related [+] Tickle due by: 2/9/2022. Signed on 1/26/2022. (MB) Modified on 1/27/2022 (MB)
Related: [-] 12
14 14 court VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 01/26 2:56 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc. Related [+] Signed on 1/26/2022. (MB)
Related: [-] 13
13 13 motion Request for Entry of Default - Failure to Defend (Adv) Wed 01/26 10:44 AM
Request for Entry of Default- Failure to Defend (Notice of Default) Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC. (Veghte, Sally)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, January 21, 2022
12 12 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Fri 01/21 5:58 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC. (Veghte, Sally)
Related: [-] 1 1
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Judgment By Default
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Monday, November 08, 2021
11 11 misc Status Report Mon 11/08 3:40 PM
Status Report Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, LLC, TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 09/22 5:54 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Hearing scheduled for 9/23/2021 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
9 9 17 pgs order Order Tue 09/21 2:56 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Signed on 9/21/2021 (LMC)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 09/21 12:20 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Hearing scheduled for 9/23/2021 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
7 7 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Mon 09/20 6:49 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Debtors' Motion for Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
6 6 misc Exhibit Tue 09/07 6:04 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice of Filing of Exhibit D to Motion for Entry of an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] 5
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Avoidance Actions
Att: 2 Exhibit B - List of Proposed Mediators
Thursday, September 02, 2021
5 5 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Thu 09/02 1:44 PM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, LLC, St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, LLC, TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Objections due by 9/16/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 05, 2021
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Thu 08/05 2:15 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC. (Veghte, Sally)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 08/05 2:13 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc.. Related [+] Tickle due by: 10/4/2021. (Veghte, Sally)
Related: [-] ument1
Monday, June 28, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 06/28 6:18 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-50974 MFW] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10385769, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Mon 06/28 4:45 PM
Adversary case 21-50974 Complaint by Center City Healthcare, LLC against Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 9/27/2021. (Veghte, Sally)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives