Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:21-bk-42600

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas J Tucker
Case #: 2:21-ap-04145
Nature of Suit81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2021
Terminated:Aug 12, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Stephen Borowski
854 New York
Lincoln Park, MI 48146
Represented By
Stephen Borowski
contact info
Defendant
Teresa Borowski
854 New York
Lincoln Park, MI 48146
Represented By
Teresa Borowski
contact info
Plaintiff
Renaissance Restoration, Inc.
40950 Woodward Ave., Ste. 100
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304
Represented By
John J. Stockdale, Jr.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Thursday, August 12, 2021
9 9 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Thu 08/12 4:15 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice and Without Costs Related [+]. (nlt)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation filed by Defendant Stephen Borowski, Defendant Teresa Borowski
8 8 misc Stipulation Thu 08/12 12:00 PM
Stipulation By and Between Kim K. Hillary, Attorney for Plaintiff and Jay S. Kalish, Attorney for Defendants Re: Entry of Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding, With Prejudice and Without Costs . Filed by Defendants Stephen Borowski, Teresa Borowski. (Kalish, Jay)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 08/12 4:16 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:21-ap-4145 : Dismissed by Stipulation. (nlt)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 08/12 4:18 PM
Adversary Case 2:21-ap-4145 Closed. (nlt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 29, 2021
7 7 order stipulated order Thu 07/29 3:14 PM
Order Extending Time For Defendants To File A Motion Or Answer To Plaintiff's Complaint And Disallowing Further Extensions Of This Deadline. Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation filed by Defendant Stephen Borowski, Defendant Teresa Borowski
6 6 misc Stipulation Thu 07/29 2:55 PM
Stipulation By and Between Kimberly K. Hillary, Attorney for Plaintiff and Jay S. Kalish, Attorney for Defendants Re: Extend the Deadline for Defendants to File a Motion or Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint until August 27, 2021 . Filed by Defendants Stephen Borowski, Teresa Borowski. (Kalish, Jay)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 12, 2021
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Mon 07/12 11:12 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendants Stephen Borowski, Teresa Borowski Related [+]. (Kalish, Jay)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Appearance
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 07/12 11:10 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendants Stephen Borowski, Teresa Borowski. (Kalish, Jay)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 01, 2021
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 07/01 4:52 PM
Summons Service Executed on Stephen Borowski 7/1/2021; Teresa Borowski 7/1/2021 (Stockdale, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 07/01 4:02 PM
Summons Issued on Stephen Borowski Answer Due 08/2/2021; Teresa Borowski Answer Due 08/2/2021 (Stockdale, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/01 4:02 PM
Adversary case 21-04145 (81 (Subordination of claim or interest)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): Complaint by Renaissance Restoration, Inc. against Stephen Borowski, Teresa Borowski. Receipt Number EXEMPT, Fee Amount of $ 350.00 is Exempt. (Stockdale, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adv Cover Sheet