Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas J Tucker
Case #: 2:21-bk-42600
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2021
Terminated:Mar 29, 2022
Plan Confirmed:Aug 05, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Renaissance Restorations, Inc.
P.O. Box 1268
Birmingham, MI 48012
Represented By
Michael E. Baum
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Saturday, August 13, 2022
291 291 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 08/14 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/13/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 290 Order Striking Document - Closed Case (text)
Thursday, August 11, 2022
290 290 order Striking Document - Closed Case (text) Thu 08/11 12:49 PM
Order of the Court to Strike: This pleading is stricken from the record, without prejudice, because the case is closed. Related [+]. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the moving party shall first file a motion to reopen the case pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 350(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and obtain an order reopening the case. . So Ordered by /s/ Judge Thomas J. Tucker (Vozniak, Mary)
Related: [-] Letter289 Letter
Monday, August 08, 2022
289 289 misc Letter Mon 08/08 2:50 PM
Letter filed by Creditors Robert and Jane Breslin (Cotton, N)
Related: [-]