Tracy Batsell et al v. Ford Motor Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Pedro V Castillo |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-05528 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1446pl Notice of Removal - Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 12, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:21-cv-01458 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 04, 2022 12:50 AM PST |
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracy Batsell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Brown
CDC AL2875 California Substance Abuse Treatment Facility & State Prison P O Box 5248
Corcoran, CA 93212 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Brown, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Devyn Cote
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janet Fiske
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jordon Kinney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wendy Krause
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diane Nichols
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Ottman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Ridgewell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bryan Ruhlow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandon Simmons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roderick White
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 17, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 01/18 2:01 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Isaac W Messmore re Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail, 28 (rolm) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
stip
Dismiss Case
Thu 01/12 10:21 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2022 | ||
28 | 28
textonly
Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail
Thu 12/22 3:58 PM
Notice of Electronic Filing re Stipulation to Dismiss Party26 , Stipulation to Dismiss Party27 , Stipulation to Dismiss Party25 , Stipulation to Dismiss Party24 e-mailed to Isaac W Messmore ike.messmore@bowmanandbrooke.com bounced due to User unknown. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2022 | ||
27 | 27
stip
Dismiss Party
Thu 12/01 3:22 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Jordon Kinney filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) |
|
26 | 26
stip
Dismiss Party
Thu 12/01 3:21 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Timothy Brown, Jr filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) |
|
25 | 25
stip
Dismiss Party
Thu 12/01 3:19 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Daniel Brown filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) |
|
24 | 24
stip
Dismiss Party
Thu 12/01 3:18 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Tracy Batsell filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) |
|
Tuesday, June 07, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Tue 06/07 1:46 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Richard Ridgewell. (Hugret, Spencer) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Tue 06/07 1:40 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Roderick White. (Hugret, Spencer) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Tue 06/07 1:39 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Bryan Ruhlow. (Hugret, Spencer) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Tue 06/07 1:39 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Richard Ridgewell. (Hugret, Spencer) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Tue 06/07 1:37 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Charles Ottman. (Hugret, Spencer) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Tue 06/07 1:36 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Diane Nichols. (Hugret, Spencer) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Tue 06/07 1:35 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Wendy Krause. (Hugret, Spencer) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Tue 06/07 1:34 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Janet Fiske. (Hugret, Spencer) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Tue 06/07 1:33 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Devyn Cote. (Hugret, Spencer) |
|
Friday, March 04, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
minutes
Settlement Conference
Fri 03/04 3:45 PM
MINUTES OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD (KAZEROUNI LAW GROUP PLAINTIFFS - FIRST GROUP) held before Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. On March 3 and 4, 2022, a settlement conference was held via Zoom on the first batch of cases referred to this Court as part of this Multi-District Litigation. (Dkt. No. 1239). After discussion off the record between the Court and the parties together and between the Court and the parties individually, settlement agreements were reached on the following twenty-three (of thirty) cases: (see document for details). The essential terms of the settlement agreements were placed on the record, and the Court ordered the record sealed. Court Recorder: CS 3/04/22. (hr) (Main Document 14 replaced on 3/4/2022) (hr) |
|
Friday, February 18, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
5
pgs
order
Order
Fri 02/18 11:04 AM
ORDER RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (KATZEROUNI PLAINTIFFS-FIRST GROUP) by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (see document for details) (hr) |
|
Att: 1 EXHIBIT LIST | ||
Thursday, September 09, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Appearance
Thu 09/09 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer) |
|
Thursday, July 08, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 07/08 4:23 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa) |
|
10 | 10
transfer
MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form
Thu 07/08 4:14 PM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (esa) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 07/08 4:12 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (esa) |
|
8 | 8
mdlcmp
Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received
Thu 07/08 4:08 PM
Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 59 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 7/1/21 regarding transfer of Case No. 0:21-cv-01458 PJS-LIB from District of Minnesota. Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-02814 AB (FFMx). (esa) |
|
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)
Thu 07/08 3:58 PM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Minnesota |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 07/08 1:56 PM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-59) transferring case to the Central District of California per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte, Jr..(kt) |
|
Wednesday, June 30, 2021 | ||
5 | 5 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/30/2021.(JLB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 7/8/2021.] | |
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
Tuesday, June 22, 2021 | ||
4 | 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 5th Division Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 21-cv-1458 (PJS/LIB). (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 7/8/2021.] | |
3 | 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Messmore, Isaac) [Transferred from Minnesota on 7/8/2021.] | |
2 | 2 Ford Motor Company's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Ford Motor Company. (Messmore, Isaac) [Transferred from Minnesota on 7/8/2021.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, case number 27-cv 21-7815 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8832270) filed by Ford Motor Company. No summons requested. (Messmore, Isaac) [Transferred from Minnesota on 7/8/2021.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B, | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |