ACF Finco I, LP v. Emergency Roadside Assistance, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-12814
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-12814
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mike K Nakagawa |
Case #: | 2:21-ap-01087 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jul 14, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 24, 2025 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Emergency Roadside Assistance, Inc.
as Resident Agent, Secretary & Treasurer 518 Mountain Estates Drive
Las Vegas, NV 89110 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ACF Finco I, LP
Attn: Talitha Gray Kozlowski/Garrett Nye 7251 Amigo Street, Ste. 210
Las Vegas, NV 89119 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM PDT |
Friday, January 24, 2025 | ||
44 | 44
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 01/24 3:13 PM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (mmm) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2023 | ||
43 | 43
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2023 | ||
42 | 42
![]() Judgment For: ACF FINCO I, LP Against: EMERGENCY ROADSIDE ASSISTANCE, INC. (mmm) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2023 | ||
41 | 41
![]() Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment (mmm) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2023 | ||
40 | 40
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2023 | ||
39 | 39
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv)
Wed 09/13 9:29 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 10/12/2023 at 01:30 PM at Remote. (mmm) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2023 | ||
38 | 38
![]() Notice of Hearing on Application for Entry of Default Judgment Hearing Date: 10/12/2023 Hearing Time: 1:30 p.m. Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
37 | 37
![]() Declaration Of: Talitha Gray Kozlowski in Support of Application for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
36 | 36
![]() Motion for Default Judgment Against: Emergency Roadside Assistance, Inc. Application for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, November 16, 2022 | ||
35 | 35
![]() Order Granting Motion To Withdraw As Attorney of Record (cly) |
|
Tuesday, November 08, 2022 | ||
34 | 34
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
33 | 33
![]() Notice of Entry of Default Against Emergency Roadside Assistance, Inc. Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
32 | 32
![]() Clerk's Entry of Default Against EMERGENCY ROADSIDE ASSISTANCE, INC. (cly) |
|
Monday, November 07, 2022 | ||
31 | 31
![]() Affidavit Of: Affidavit of Talitha Gray Kozlowski, Esq. in Support of Request for Entry of Default Against Emergency Roadside Assistance, Inc. Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
30 | 30
![]() Request/Praecipe for Default against Emergency Roadside Assistance, Inc. Request for Entry of Default Against Emergency Roadside Assistance, Inc. Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2022 | ||
29 | 29
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
28 | 28
![]() Notice of Intent to Take Default Three Day Notice of Intent to Take Default Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
Friday, October 14, 2022 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Order Granting Motion To Withdraw As Attorney of Record DAVID J. WINTERTON terminated from the case. (cly) |
|
Thursday, October 06, 2022 | ||
26 | 26
court
Minute Entry Continued (ADV)
Thu 10/06 4:04 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 10/6/2022 10:00 AM. Continued. Appearances: DAVID J. WINTERTON, TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI Status Hearing to be held on 12/29/2022 at 10:30 AM at MKN Teleconference Line. (cas) |
|
Tuesday, September 13, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv)
Tue 09/13 8:49 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 10/12/2022 at 09:30 AM at Remote. (mmm) |
|
Monday, September 12, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Affidavit Of: David J. Winterton Filed by DAVID J. WINTERTON on behalf of EMERGENCY ROADSIDE ASSISTANCE, INC. (WINTERTON, DAVID) |
|
23 | 23
![]() Amended Notice of Hearing Hearing Date: 10/12/2022 Hearing Time: 9:30 a.m. with Certificate of Service Filed by DAVID J. WINTERTON on behalf of EMERGENCY ROADSIDE ASSISTANCE, INC. (WINTERTON, DAVID) |
|
22 | 22
![]() Amended Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Filed by DAVID J. WINTERTON on behalf of EMERGENCY ROADSIDE ASSISTANCE, INC. (WINTERTON, DAVID) |
|
Thursday, September 08, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv)
Thu 09/08 10:41 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 10/12/2022 at 09:30 AM at Remote. (mmm) |
|
20 | 20
![]() Notice of Docketing Error (mmm) |
|
Wednesday, September 07, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Notice of Hearing Hearing Date: 10/12/2022 Hearing Time: 9:30 a.m. with Certificate of Service Filed by DAVID J. WINTERTON on behalf of EMERGENCY ROADSIDE ASSISTANCE, INC. (WINTERTON, DAVID) |
|
18 | 18
![]() Affidavit Of: David J. Winterton Filed by DAVID J. WINTERTON on behalf of EMERGENCY ROADSIDE ASSISTANCE, INC. (WINTERTON, DAVID) |
|
17 | 17
![]() Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Filed by DAVID J. WINTERTON on behalf of EMERGENCY ROADSIDE ASSISTANCE, INC. (WINTERTON, DAVID) |
|
Thursday, August 25, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Discovery Plan Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, January 07, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Amended Notice of Hearing Amended Notice of Continued Scheduling Conference Hearing Date: 10/06/2022 Hearing Time: 10:00 a.m. Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
Thursday, January 06, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
court
Minute Entry Continued (ADV)
Thu 01/06 2:40 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 1/13/2022 10:00 AM. Continued. (Hearing scheduled 10/06/2022 at 10:00 AM at Remote. (sm) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Notice of Docketing Error (cly) |
|
12 | 12
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference)
Thu 01/06 1:04 PM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/6/2022 at 10:00 AM at Remote. (cly) |
|
Wednesday, January 05, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Notice of Hearing Notice of Continued Scheduling Conference Hearing Date: 10/06/2022 Hearing Time: 10:00 a.m. Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
Thursday, October 14, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference)
Thu 10/14 3:42 PM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 1/13/2022 at 10:00 AM at Remote. (cly) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
Wednesday, October 13, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Hearing Notice of Continued Scheduling Conference Hearing Date: 01/13/2022 Hearing Time: 10:00 a.m. Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
Thursday, July 15, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Summons Service Executed on EMERGENCY ROADSIDE ASSISTANCE, INC. 7/15/2021 Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Summons Issued on EMERGENCY ROADSIDE ASSISTANCE, INC. (cly) |
|
5 | 5
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference)
Thu 07/15 12:37 PM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 11/18/2021 at 10:00 AM at Remote. (cly) |
|
Wednesday, July 14, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Corporate Ownership Statement PLAINTIFF ACF FINCO I, LPS CORPORATE OWNERSHIP STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. BANKR. P. 7007.1 AND LR 7007.1 Corporate parents added to case: Ares Holdings L.P., a Delaware entity.Corporate Affiliates added to case:, ACF FinCo GP LLC, a Delaware entity, ACF Intermediate GP LLC, a Delaware entity, ACF Intermediate Holdings LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Commercial Finance GP LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Commercial Finance LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Management Corporation, a Delaware entity, Ares Management Holdings LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Management LLC, a Delaware entity PLAINTIFF ACF FINCO I, LPS CORPORATE OWNERSHIP STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. BANKR. P. 7007.1 AND LR 7007.1 Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF Finco I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Request to Issue Summons
Wed 07/14 1:56 PM
Request to Issue Summons On: Emergency Roadside Assistance, Inc.. Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF Finco I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-docket of online payment
Wed 07/14 11:03 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint 21-01087 mkn) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 20269464, fee amount $ 350.00 (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-01087 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547 and 550 Filed by ACF Finco I, LP vs. Emergency Roadside Assistance, Inc. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)(GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |