Joint Admin
|
2:20-bk-12815 - BEACHHEAD ROOFING AND SUPPLY, INC. (JNT CON - LEAD CASE# 20-12814)
|
06/11/2020
|
Joint Admin
|
2:20-bk-12816 - CALIFORNIA EQUIPMENT LEASING ASSOCIATION, INC.
|
06/11/2020
|
Joint Admin
|
2:20-bk-12818 - FENCES 4 AMERICA, INC. (JNT CON - LEAD CASE# 20-12814)
|
06/11/2020
|
Joint Admin
|
2:20-bk-12819 - JAMES PETERSEN INDUSTRIES, INC. (JNT CON - LEAD CASE# 20-12814)
|
06/11/2020
|
Joint Admin
|
2:20-bk-12820 - PD SOLAR, INC. (JNT CON - LEAD CASE# 20-12814)
|
06/11/2020
|
Joint Admin
|
2:20-bk-12821 - PETERSEN-DEAN, INC. (JNT CON - LEAD CASE# 20-12814)
|
06/11/2020
|
Joint Admin
|
2:20-bk-12822 - PETERSEN ROOFING AND SOLAR LLC (JNT CON - LEAD CASE# 20-12814)
|
06/11/2020
|
Joint Admin
|
2:20-bk-12823 - PETERSENDEAN HAWAII LLC (JNT CON - LEAD CASE# 20-12814)
|
06/11/2020
|
Joint Admin
|
2:20-bk-12824 - PETERSENDEAN ROOFING AND SOLAR SYSTEMS, INC. (JNT CON - LEAD CASE# 20-12814)
|
06/11/2020
|
Joint Admin
|
2:20-bk-12825 - PETERSENDEAN TEXAS, INC. (JNT CON - LEAD CASE# 20-12814)
|
06/11/2020
|
Joint Admin
|
2:20-bk-12826 - ROOFS 4 AMERICA, INC. (JNT CON - LEAD CASE# 20-12814)
|
06/11/2020
|
Joint Admin
|
2:20-bk-12827 - SOLAR 4 AMERICA, INC. (JNT CON - LEAD CASE# 20-12814)
|
06/11/2020
|
Joint Admin
|
2:20-bk-12829 - SONOMA ROOFING SERVICES, INC. (JNT CON - LEAD CASE# 20-12814)
|
06/11/2020
|
Joint Admin
|
2:20-bk-12831 - TRI-VALLEY SUPPLY, INC. (JNT CON - LEAD CASE# 20-12814)
|
06/11/2020
|
Joint Admin
|
2:20-bk-12833 - TD VENTURE FUND LLC (JNT CON - LEAD CASE# 20-12814)
|
06/11/2020
|
Adversary
|
2:20-ap-01118 - WERNER et al v. PETERSEN-DEAN, INC. et al
|
09/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01012 - PETERSEN-DEAN, INC. v. ELEV8 CONSTRUCTION, INC.
|
01/29/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01013 - PETERSENDEAN ROOFING AND SOLAR SYSTEMS, INC. v. DIVINITY HOMES, INC.
|
01/29/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01017 - PETERSENDEAN ROOFING AND SOLAR SYSTEMS, INC. v. JKB LIVING, INC.
|
02/02/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01018 - ROOFS 4 AMERICA, INC. et al v. SILICONSAGE CONSTRUCTION, INC.
|
02/02/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01019 - MERITAGE HOMES CORPORATION et al v. RED ROSE, INC. et al
|
02/03/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01020 - PETERSEN-DEAN, INC. v. JKB LIVING, INC.
|
02/10/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01021 - JAMES PETERSEN INDUSTRIES, INC. v. SILICONSAGE CONSTRUCTION, INC.
|
02/10/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01084 - ACF FINCO I LP v. BERRIDGE MANUFACTURING COMPANY
|
07/13/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01085 - ACF FINCO I LP v. DIAMANTE SHEET METAL, LLC
|
07/13/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01086 - ACF Finco I, LP v. EB Roofing LLC
|
07/14/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01087 - ACF Finco I, LP v. Emergency Roadside Assistance, Inc.
|
07/14/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01088 - ACF Finco I, LP v. Eusebio Guevara d/b/a Guevara Roofing Services
|
07/14/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01089 - ACF Finco I, LP v. Gibbor Construction, Inc.
|
07/14/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01090 - ACF Finco I, LP v. JC Custom Roofing, Inc.
|
07/14/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01091 - ACF Finco I, LP v. JC Roofing, L.L.C.
|
07/14/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01092 - ACF Finco I, LP v. JJ Best Roofing LLC
|
07/14/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01093 - ACF Finco I, LP v. John E. Patison d/b/a JP Electrical Power & Contro
|
07/14/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01094 - ACF Finco I, LP v. Juan E. Cruz d/b/a Juan Cruz Roofing
|
07/14/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01095 - ACF Finco I, LP v. R&R Services Inc.
|
07/14/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01096 - ACF Finco I, LP v. Primos Roofing and Construction Inc.
|
07/14/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01097 - ACF Finco I, LP v. Penske Truck Leasing Co.,LP et al
|
07/14/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01098 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. ALMAGUER D/B/A/ SOL SHEET METAL ROOFING
|
07/14/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01099 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. DURAN D/B/A V & S MATERIAL STOCKERS
|
07/14/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01100 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. VALLEY GUTTER SUPPLY, INC.
|
07/14/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01126 - PETERSEN-DEAN, INC. et al v. SOLARJUICE AMERICAN, INC.
|
07/29/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01141 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. NATURAL CONCEPTS MARKETING GROUP INC. d/b/a AD LEV
|
09/16/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01142 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. ALAMEDA COUNTY
|
09/16/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01143 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. ARCH COMPANIES, LLC D/B/A ARCH ROOFING
|
09/16/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01144 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. CHOWCHILLA ELEMENTARY SCHOOL DISTRICT
|
09/16/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01145 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. CUSTOM BILT HOLDINGS, LLC D/B/A CUSTOM-BILT METALS
|
09/16/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01146 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. JA GUTTER AND SOFFIT LLC
|
09/16/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01147 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. JR METAL EXPRESS, INC.
|
09/16/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01148 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. OKTA INC.
|
09/16/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01149 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. NICK BARBIERI TRUCKING, LLC D/B/A REDWOOD COAST FU
|
09/16/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01150 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. RIEDEL CONSTRUCTION, INC.
|
09/16/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01151 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. SOUTHERN COUNTIES OIL CO., D/B/A SC FUELS
|
09/16/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01152 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. SILFAB SOLAR USA, INC.
|
09/16/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01153 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. SOMBRILLA ROOFING LLC
|
09/16/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01155 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. TPX COMMUNICATIONS CO.
|
09/16/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01156 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. VAR TECHNOLOGY FINANCE NORTH AMERICA, INC.
|
09/16/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01157 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. WEST COAST EQUIPMENT LLC
|
09/16/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01158 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. AMERICAN BUILDERS & CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO., INC. D
|
09/20/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01164 - ACF FINCO I, LP et al v. HALEAKALA SOLAR, INC.
|
10/11/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01245 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. ALPHA SUPPLY, LLC
|
11/19/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01246 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. FASTENERS, INC.
|
11/19/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01247 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. HIGHMORRE FINANCING CO., IV, LLC
|
11/19/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01248 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. INDEPENDENT ELECTRIC SUPPLY, INC.
|
11/19/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01249 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. THE SOLARAY CORPORATION d/b/a INTER-ISLAND SOLARY
|
11/19/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01250 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. MUTUAL OF OMAHA INSURANCE COMPANY et al
|
11/19/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01251 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC
|
11/19/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01253 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. ROOF STOCKERS OF ARIZONA LLC
|
11/19/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01254 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. TAYLOR METAL, INC. d/b/a TAYLOR METAL PRODUCTS
|
11/19/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01255 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
|
11/19/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-01256 - ACF FINCO I, LP v. BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC.
|
11/19/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01073 - ACF FINCO I LP v. ALOHA WASTE SYSTEMS, INC.
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01074 - ACF FINCO I LP v. REDWOOD FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY d/b/a BERKSHIRE
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01075 - ACF FINCO I LP v. CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01076 - ACF FINCO I LP v. LEO CALIXTO ARTEAGA d/b/a CALIXTO SHEET METAL
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01077 - ACF FINCO I LP v. JUAN CEJA d/b/a CEJA TRUCKING
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01078 - ACF FINCO I LP v. COAST COUNTIES TRUCK & EQUIPMENT COMPANY d/b/a COA
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01079 - ACF FINCO I LP v. DIVERSIFIED PRODUCTS USA LLC
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01080 - ACF FINCO I LP v. DURABLE STRUCTURES LTD.
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01081 - ACF FINCO I LP v. MANCIA
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01082 - ACF FINCO I LP v. ELITE ROOFING SUPPLY
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01083 - ACF FINCO I LP v. FEDERAL ARBITRATION, INC.
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01084 - ACF FINCO I LP v. GARZA ROOFING
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01085 - ACF FINCO I LP v. IMPERIAL CAPITAL, LLC
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01086 - ACF FINCO I LP v. JJ ROOFING & SHEET METAL
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01087 - ACF FINCO I LP v. JUAN JARQUIN VAZQUEZ d/b/a JUAN'S ROOFING
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01088 - ACF FINCO I LP v. KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01089 - ACF FINCO I LP v. LEO SHEET METAL ROOFING
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01090 - ACF FINCO I LP v. LIQUID CAPITAL EXCHANGE, INC.
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01091 - ACF FINCO I LP v. TCI CONTRACTING, LLC d/b/a NATIONWIDE GUTTER and N
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01092 - ACF FINCO I LP v. NAVIA BENEFIT SOLUTIONS, INC.
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01093 - ACF FINCO I LP v. PEDRO ANTONIO HERNANDEZ d/b/a P & R BROTHERS ROOFI
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01094 - ACF FINCO I LP v. PRIME REVENUE, INC.
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01095 - ACF FINCO I LP v. SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01096 - ACF FINCO I LP v. SERVICE FINANCE COMPANY, LLC
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01097 - ACF FINCO I LP v. SRS DISTRIBUTION, INC. d/b/a SG WHOLESALE ROOFING
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01098 - ACF FINCO I LP v. STERLING CONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS, LLC
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01099 - ACF FINCO I LP v. SUNBELT RENTALS, INC.
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01100 - ACF FINCO I LP v. TESLA, INC.
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01101 - ACF FINCO I LP v. UNITED RENTALS, INC.
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01102 - ACF FINCO I LP v. Y ESPINAL ROOFING, LLC
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01103 - ACF FINCO I LP v. TARGRAY INTERNATIONAL, INC.
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01104 - ACF FINCO I LP v. AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL RELATED SERVICES COMPANY,
|
05/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01107 - ACF FINCO I LP v. CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY
|
06/08/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01108 - ACF FINCO I LP v. CITIBANK, N.A.
|
06/08/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01110 - ACF FINCO I LP v. ZANKLER ROAD RESOURCE MANAGEMENT, LLC d/b/a FLORIN
|
06/10/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01111 - ACF FINCO I LP v. ACCENT BUILDING MATERIALS, INC. d/b/a NATCO FASTEN
|
06/10/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-01164 - BEACHHEAD ROOFING AND SUPPLY, INC. et al v. PETERSEN et al
|
12/16/2022
|