Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ronald B King
Case #: 5:21-bk-50951
Case Filed:Jul 31, 2021
Plan Confirmed:May 19, 2022

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
BVF Fund II, LLC, BVF Fund II, LLC
2323 Buena Vista St
San Antonio, TX 78207-3704
Represented By
H. Anthony Hervol
Law Office Of H. Anthony Hervol
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago
Saturday, August 31, 2024
171 171 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 08/31 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/31/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 170 Order Regarding (related document(s):166 Third Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of H. anthony Hervol, Counsel For the Debtor-in-Possession, Fees $ 44,280.00, Expenses $ 2,530.46, For Time Period From May 1, 2023 To Time Period Ending August 19, 2024 filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Attorney H. Anthony Hervol (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" # 2 Exhibit "B" # 3 Exhibit "C" # 4 Proposed Order)(Hervol, H.)) (Order entered on 8/29/2024)
Thursday, August 29, 2024
170 170 order BK-Regarding Matter (pdf) Thu 08/29 1:42 PM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 8/29/2024) (McGee, Maxine)
Related: [-] 166 Third Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of H. anthony Hervol, Counsel For the Debtor-in-Possession, Fees $ 44,280.00, Expenses $ 2,530.46, For Time Period From May 1, 2023 To Time Period Ending August 19, 2024 filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Attorney H. Anthony Hervol (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" # 2 Exhibit "B" # 3 Exhibit "C" # 4 Proposed Order)(Hervol, H.)
court Hearing Held Thu 08/29 11:40 AM
Hearing Held: Approved as funds are available-Order Signed . Related [+] (McGee, Maxine)
Related: [-] 166 Third Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of H. anthony Hervol, Counsel For the Debtor-in-Possession, Fees $ 44,280.00, Expenses $ 2,530.46, For Time Period From May 1, 2023 To Time Period Ending August 19, 2024 filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Attorney H. Anthony Hervol (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" # 2 Exhibit "B" # 3 Exhibit "C" # 4 Proposed Order)(Hervol, H.)
Monday, August 26, 2024
169 169 misc Notice of Hearing Mon 08/26 5:09 PM
Notice of Hearing filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Attorney H. Anthony Hervol. (Hervol, H.) Related [+]
Related: [-] 166 Third Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of H. anthony Hervol, Counsel For the Debtor-in-Possession, Fees $ 44,280.00, Expenses $ 2,530.46, For Time Period From May 1, 2023 To Time Period Ending August 19, 2024 filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Attorney H. Anthony Hervol (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" # 2 Exhibit "B" # 3 Exhibit "C" # 4 Proposed Order)(Hervol, H.)
168 168 order BK-Regarding Matter (pdf) Mon 08/26 1:49 PM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 8/26/2024) (Hardage, Bridget)
Related: [-] 167 Motion to for Expedited Hearing on Third Application for Compsensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of H. Anthony Hervol, Counsel For the Debtor-in-Possession filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Attorney H. Anthony Hervol (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hervol, H.) (Related Document(s):166 Third Application for Compensation, Fees $ 44,280.00, Expenses $ 2,530.46, For Time Period From May 1, 2023 To Time Period Ending August 19, 2024 filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Attorney H. Anthony Hervol (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" # 2 Exhibit "B" # 3 Exhibit "C" # 4 Proposed Order)(Hervol, H.))
167 167 motion Expedite Hearing Mon 08/26 12:33 PM
Motion to for Expedited Hearing on Third Application for Compsensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of H. Anthony Hervol, Counsel For the Debtor-in-Possession filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Attorney H. Anthony Hervol(Hervol, H.) Related [+]
Related: [-] 166 Third Application for Compensation, Fees $ 44,280.00, Expenses $ 2,530.46, For Time Period From May 1, 2023 To Time Period Ending August 19, 2024 filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Attorney H. Anthony Hervol (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" # 2 Exhibit "B" # 3 Exhibit "C" # 4 Proposed Order)(Hervol, H.)
Att: 1 Proposed Order
166 166 motion Compensation Mon 08/26 12:26 PM
Third Application for Compensation, Fees $ 44,280.00, Expenses $ 2,530.46, For Time Period From May 1, 2023 To Time Period Ending August 19, 2024 filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Attorney H. Anthony Hervol(Hervol, H.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "A"
Att: 2 Exhibit "B"
Att: 3 Exhibit "C"
Att: 4 Proposed Order
court Hearing Continued (NO FORM) Mon 08/26 1:17 PM
Hearing RESET Related [+]
Related: [-] 166 Third Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of H. anthony Hervol, Counsel For the Debtor-in-Possession, Fees $44,280.00, Expenses $2,530.46, For Time Period From May 1, 2023 To Time Period Ending August 19, 2024 filed by Attorney H. Anthony Hervol. Hearing Scheduled For 8/29/2024 at 10:00 AM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***SET ON EXPEDITED BASIS - MR. HERVOL SHALL BE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE TO PARTIES***.
court Hearing Continued (NO FORM) Mon 08/26 1:17 PM
Hearing set on Related [+]
Related: [-] 166 Third Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of H. anthony Hervol, Counsel For the Debtor-in-Possession, Fees $44,280.00, Expenses $2,530.46, For Time Period From May 1, 2023 To Time Period Ending August 19, 2024 filed by Attorney H. Anthony Hervol. Hearing Scheduled For 8/29/2024 at 10:00 AM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***SET ON EXPEDITED BASIS - MR. HERVOL SHALL BE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE TO PARTIES***.