Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 0:20-bk-23935

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Peter D Russin
Case #: 0:21-ap-01261
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Aug 04, 2021
Terminated:May 05, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Edfinancial Services, U.S. Dept of Ed.
Represented By
Edfinancial Services, U.S. Dept of Ed.
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephanie Lynne Correa
164 Westbury J
Deerfield Beach, FL 33442
Represented By
Stephanie Lynne Correa
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Thursday, May 05, 2022
28 28 court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/05 12:59 PM
Adversary Case 0:21-ap-1261 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Romero, Christina)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
27 27 court Transcript Fri 12/10 7:13 PM
Transcript of 11/17/2021 Hearing. [ Transcript will be restricted for a period of 90 days. ] Related [+]. Redaction Request Due By 12/17/2021. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 01/3/2022. Redacted Transcript Due by 01/10/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 03/10/2022. (Ouellette and Mauldin)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Stephanie Lynne Correa , or in the alternative Motion to Abate Adversary Proceeding Filed by Creditor United States of America, Department of Education
Thursday, December 09, 2021
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 12/10 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/09/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Re:15 ), Denying Motion to Abate (Re:15 )
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
25 25 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Wed 12/08 10:33 AM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Raychelle A Tasher Related [+]. (Tasher, Raychelle)
Related: [-] 24 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding, Order on Motion to Abate
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
24 24 order Abate Order Tue 12/07 10:26 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+], Denying Motion to Abate (Grooms, Desiree)
Related: [-] #15 #15
Wednesday, October 27, 2021
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 10/28 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/27/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order Setting Deadlines For Briefing Schedule and Setting Hearing (Re:15 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Creditor United States of America, Department of Education). Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2021 at 10:00 AM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 301 (PDR), Fort Lauderdale, FL.
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
22 22 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Tue 10/26 11:44 AM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Raychelle A Tasher Related [+]. (Tasher, Raychelle)
Related: [-] 21 Order Setting Hearing
Monday, October 25, 2021
21 21 3 pgs order Order Setting Hearing Mon 10/25 10:19 AM
Order Setting Deadlines For Briefing Schedule and Setting Hearing Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2021 at 10:00 AM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 301 (PDR), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Grooms, Desiree)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Creditor United States of America, Department of Education
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 10/21 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 10/20/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order Continuing Status Hearing (Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Stephanie Lynne Correa). Status hearing to be held on 01/27/2022 at 10:00 AM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 301 (PDR), Fort Lauderdale, FL.
Monday, October 18, 2021
19 19 2 pgs order Order Continuing Status Hearing/Conference Mon 10/18 3:25 PM
Order Continuing Status Hearing Related [+]. Status hearing to be held on 01/27/2022 at 10:00 AM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 301 (PDR), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Grooms, Desiree)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Stephanie Lynne Correa
Thursday, October 07, 2021
18 18 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Thu 10/07 1:52 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Raychelle A Tasher Related [+]. (Tasher, Raychelle)
Related: [-] 17 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued
17 17 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Thu 10/07 12:16 PM
Amended Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 10/28/2021 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference. (Manboard, Sandra)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Stephanie Lynne Correa , or in the alternative Motion to Abate Adversary Proceeding Filed by Creditor United States of America, Department of Education filed by Creditor United States of America, Department of Education
16 16 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Thu 10/07 11:05 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/04/2021 at 10:00 AM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 301 (PDR), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Manboard, Sandra)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Stephanie Lynne Correa , or in the alternative Motion to Abate Adversary Proceeding Filed by Creditor United States of America, Department of Education filed by Creditor United States of America, Department of Education
15 15 motion Abate Thu 10/07 10:08 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Stephanie Lynne Correa , or in the alternative Motion to Abate Adversary Proceeding Filed by Creditor United States of America, Department of Education (Tasher, Raychelle)
Related: [-]
14 14 utility Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency [ECF] Thu 10/07 9:02 AM
Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Selected Event Does Not Match PDF Image. MULTIPLE RELIEF MOTION. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO REFILE PLEADING USING THE CORRECT EVENTS: MOTION TO DISMISS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING AND MOTION TO ABATE Related [+] (Grooms, Desiree)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Stephanie Lynne Correa or in the Alternative, Motion to Abate Adversary Proceeding Filed by Creditor United States of America, Department of Education
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
13 13 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 10/06 10:24 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Stephanie Lynne Correa or in the Alternative, Motion to Abate Adversary Proceeding Filed by Creditor United States of America, Department of Education (Tasher, Raychelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/08 4:48 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by United States of America, Department of Education. (Tasher, Raychelle)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Wed 09/08 11:01 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Raychelle A Tasher Filed by Creditor United States of America, Department of Education. (Tasher, Raychelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 18, 2021
10 10 notice Notice of Filing Wed 08/18 10:08 AM
Notice of Filing ORIGINAL DOCUMENT , Filed by Plaintiff Stephanie Lynne Correa Related [+]. (Grooms, Desiree)
Related: [-] 8 Summons Service Executed
9 9 notice Notice of Filing Wed 08/18 9:59 AM
Notice of Filing ORIGINAL DOCUMENT, Filed by Plaintiff Stephanie Lynne Correa Related [+]. (Grooms, Desiree)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, August 09, 2021
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 08/10 11:26 AM
Summons Service Executed on Edfinancial Services, U.S. Dept of Ed. 8/9/2021 Filed by Plaintiff Stephanie Lynne Correa , Defendant Edfinancial Services, U.S. Dept of Ed. . (Grooms, Desiree)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 06, 2021
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 08/07 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 08/06/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Transmittal of PDF Document to BNC for Noticing (Re:2 Summons and Notice of Status Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Edfinancial Services, U.S. Dept of Ed. Answer Due 9/3/2021 (Re:1 Adversary case 21-01261 Complaint by Stephanie Lynne Correa against Edfinancial Services, U.S. Dept of Ed. . Filing Fee Not Required. Nature of Suit: ,(63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)) (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet)) Status hearing to be held on 10/14/2021 at 10:00 AM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 301 (PDR), Fort Lauderdale, FL.)
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 08/07 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/06/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Status Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Edfinancial Services, U.S. Dept of Ed. Answer Due 9/3/2021 (Re:1 Adversary case 21-01261 Complaint by Stephanie Lynne Correa against Edfinancial Services, U.S. Dept of Ed. . Filing Fee Not Required. Nature of Suit: ,(63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)) (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet)) Status hearing to be held on 10/14/2021 at 10:00 AM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 301 (PDR), Fort Lauderdale, FL.
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 08/07 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/06/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Setting Status Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re:2 Summons and Notice of Status Conference).
Wednesday, August 04, 2021
4 4 court Notice of PDF Document to BNC Wed 08/04 2:56 PM
Notice of Transmittal of PDF Document to BNC for Noticing Related [+] (Grooms, Desiree)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Status Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Edfinancial Services, U.S. Dept of Ed. Answer Due 9/3/2021 (Re:1 Adversary case 21-01261 Complaint by Stephanie Lynne Correa against Edfinancial Services, U.S. Dept of Ed. . Filing Fee Not Required. Nature of Suit: ,(63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)) (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet)) Status hearing to be held on 10/14/2021 at 10:00 AM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 301 (PDR), Fort Lauderdale, FL.
3 3 4 pgs order Order Setting Status Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 08/04 1:46 PM
Order Setting Status Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Grooms, Desiree)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Status Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Status Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 08/04 1:44 PM
Summons and Notice of Status Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Edfinancial Services, U.S. Dept of Ed. Answer Due 9/3/2021 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 10/14/2021 at 10:00 AM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 301 (PDR), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Grooms, Desiree)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 21-01261 Complaint by Stephanie Lynne Correa against Edfinancial Services, U.S. Dept of Ed. . Filing Fee Not Required. Nature of Suit: ,(63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)) (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet)
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/04 1:05 PM
Adversary case 21-01261 Complaint by Stephanie Lynne Correa against Edfinancial Services, U.S. Dept of Ed. . Filing Fee Not Required. Nature of Suit: ,(63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)) (Grooms, Desiree)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet