Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-22878

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Deborah L Thorne
Case #: 1:21-ap-00136
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2021
Terminated:Jul 08, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
340B Technologies Inc. dba 340Basics
Represented By
340B Technologies Inc. dba 340Basics
contact info
Plaintiff
Ira Bodenstein, the chapter 7 trustee for the bankruptcy estate of Pipeline Westlake Hospital, LLC
Represented By
Allen J Guon
Cozen O'Connor
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:06 PM CDT
Friday, July 08, 2022
13 13 court Close Adversary Case Fri 07/08 12:47 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-136 Closed . (Roman, Felipe)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
12 12 notice Notice of Dismissal Thu 07/07 1:10 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Allen J Guon on behalf of Ira Bodenstein, the chapter 7 trustee for the bankruptcy estate of Pipeline Westlake Hospital, LLC. (Guon, Allen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
11 11 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 06/30 3:03 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 07/14/2022 at 09:30 AM at Appear Using Zoom for Government - Judge Thorne, , , .. Signed on 06/30/2022. (Smith, Lester)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, May 05, 2022
10 10 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 05/05 3:02 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 06/30/2022 at 09:30 AM at Appear Using Zoom for Government - Judge Thorne.. Signed on 05/05/2022. (Smith, Lester)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, March 17, 2022
9 9 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 03/17 3:21 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 05/05/2022 at 09:30 AM at Appear Using Zoom for Government - Judge Thorne, , , .. Signed on 03/17/2022. (Smith, Lester)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, January 27, 2022
8 8 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 01/27 2:05 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 03/17/2022 at 09:30 AM at Appear Using Zoom for Government - Judge Thorne, , , .. Signed on 01/27/2022. (Smith, Lester)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, December 16, 2021
7 7 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 12/16 11:49 AM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 01/27/2022 at 09:30 AM at Appear Using Zoom for Government - Judge Thorne, , , .. Signed on 12/16/2021. (Smith, Lester)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, October 21, 2021
6 6 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 10/21 2:47 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 12/16/2021 at 09:30 AM at Appear Using Zoom for Government - Judge Thorne, , , .. Signed on 10/21/2021. (Smith, Lester)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, August 13, 2021
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 08/13 12:08 PM
Summons Service Executed on 340B Technologies Inc. dba 340Basics Related [+]. (Guon, Allen)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Monday, August 09, 2021
4 4 utility U - Corrective Entry Mon 08/09 9:43 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: to correct docket text Related [+]. (Gomez, Denise)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, August 05, 2021
3 3 crditcrd none Thu 08/05 12:59 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 21-00136 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A43768168. Fee Amount $ 350.00 (Guon, Allen) Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 08/05 10:07 AM
Summons Issued on 340B Technologies Inc. dba 340Basics Answer Due 09/7/2021 (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/05 10:07 AM
Adversary case 21-00136 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): Complaint by Ira Bodenstein, the chapter 7 trustee for the bankruptcy estate of Pipeline Westlake Hospital, LLC against 340B Technologies Inc. dba 340Basics. Fee Amount $350. Status hearing to be held on 10/21/2021 at 09:30 AM at Appear Using Zoom for Government - Judge Thorne. (Guon, Allen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet