Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Deborah L Thorne
Case #: 1:19-bk-22878
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2019
Creditor Meeting:Oct 02, 2019
Claims Deadline:Jan 06, 2020
Terminated:May 21, 2024

Debtor
Westlake Property Holdings, LLC
1225 W. Lake Street
Melrose Park, IL 60160
Represented By
Scott R Clar
Crane, Simon, Clar & Dan
contact info
Jeffrey R Waxman
Morris James LLP
contact info
Jeffrey C Dan
Goldstein & Mcclintock Lllp
contact info
Eric J Monzo
Morris James LLP
contact info
Robert M Fishman
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Brya Michele Keilson
Morris James LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Special Party
SRC Hospital Investments II, LLC
Represented By
Rosanne Ciambrone
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
John R Weiss
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Trustee
Ira Bodenstein
Fox Rothschild LLP 321 N Clark Street Suite 1600
Chicago, IL 60654
Represented By
Terence G Banich
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
David R Doyle
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Joshua D. Greene
Springer Larsen Greene, LLC
contact info
Christina Sanfelippo
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Jeffrey L. Widman
Fox Rothschild, LLP
contact info
Thomas E Springer
Springer Larsen Greene, LLC
contact info
Robert M Fishman
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Allen J Guon
Fox Rothschild
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604

GPO Sep 24 2019
Memorandum Opinion (RE: 22 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Abstention, 23 Generic Motion). (Williams, Daphne)

Docket last updated: 03/25/2024 12:44 PM CDT

Create an account to get the full docket for this case.