Pruitt v. Asphalt Zipper
Original Case: 6:18-cv-00324
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-pcd-50717 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 10, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jul 20, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 21, 2022 3:30 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
Asphalt Zipper, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Chuck Pruitt
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 20 2022
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-50717 Affirmed ] Judge: EBC , Judge: JEG , Judge: GJC. Mandate issue date is 08/11/2022 [21-50717] |
Docket last updated: 07/21/2022 3:30 AM CDT |
Tuesday, August 10, 2021 | ||
CASE CAPTION updated. Party information modified for Asphalt Zipper, Incorporated in 21-50717 Party type changed to appellant. 21-50717 (LEF) | ||
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Asphalt Zipper, Incorporated 21-50717 (LEF) |