Consolidated
Lead case: 1:21-md-03010

New York Southern District Court
Judge:P Kevin Castel
Case #: 1:21-cv-06796
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation (Monopolizing Trade)
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2021
Terminated:Feb 28, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 08, 2022 4:15 AM EST
Defendant
Facebook Inc.
Represented By
Kevin Orsini
Cravath Swaine & Moore
contact info
Jeffrey M. Wakefield
Flaherty Sensabaugh & Bonasso
contact info
Peter T Barbur
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Vanessa Lavely
Cravath Swaine & Moore
contact info
Vanessa Allen Lavely
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Kevin J. Orsini
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Peter Barbur
Cravath Swaine & Moore
contact info
Defendant
Google LLC
Represented By
Justina K. Sessions
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info
Isaac Ralston Forman
Hissam Forman Donovan Ritchie
contact info
Max C. Gottlieb
Hissam Forman Donovan Ritchie
contact info
Jonathan M. Jacobson
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info
Michael B. Hissam
Hissam Forman Donovan Ritchie
contact info
Plaintiff
HD Media Company, LLC
Represented By
Steven Michael Jodlowski
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd
contact info
David W. Mitchell
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd Llp (sandiego)
contact info
Paul Jeffrey Geller
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Clayton J. Fitzsimmons
Fitzsimmons Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Steven M Jodlowski
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd Llp (san Diego)
contact info
Mark A. Colantonio
Fitzsimmons Law Firm
contact info
John C. Herman
Herman Jones
contact info
Robert P. Fitzsimmons
Fitzsimmons Law Firm
contact info
Serina M. Vash
Herman Jones
contact info
Robert Patrick Fitzsimmons
Fitzsimmons Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Stuart A. Davidson
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd Llp (fl)
contact info
Michael Jay Fuller, Jr.
Mchugh Fuller Law Group
contact info
Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Farrell & Fuller
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 04/10 11:17 AM
ORDER granting (136) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (137) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-03446-PKC; granting (934) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (935) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC; granting (74) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (75) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06794-PKC; granting (84) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (85) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06796-PKC; granting (69) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (70) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06824-PKC; granting (79) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (80) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06828-PKC; granting (76) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (77) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06817-PKC; granting (94) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (95) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06840-PKC; granting (271) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (272) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06841-PKC; granting (119) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (120) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06870-PKC; granting (97) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (98) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06871-PKC; granting (76) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (77) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06881-PKC; granting (76) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (77) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06884-PKC; granting (85) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (86) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06888-PKC; granting (70) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (71) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06909-PKC; granting (80) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (81) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06910-PKC; granting (92) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (93) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06912-PKC; granting (222) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (223) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-07001-PKC; granting (179) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (180) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-07034-PKC; granting (84) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (85) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-07045-PKC; granting (67) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (68) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06915-PKC; granting (63) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (64) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-08032-PKC; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (66) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-09523-PKC; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-10186-PKC; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-10187-PKC; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-10188-PKC; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-01693-PKC; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-01701-PKC; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-01704-PKC; granting (67) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (68) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-01705-PKC; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-01971-PKC; granting (68) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (69) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-06997-PKC; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (43) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-09810-PKC; granting (104) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (105) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:23-cv-01530-PKC; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:23-cv-01532-PKC; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:23-cv-03651-PKC; granting (74) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (75) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:23-cv-05177-PKC; granting (28) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (29) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:24-cv-03063-PKC; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:24-cv-09904-PKC (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (Nacanther, Florence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
85 85 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 04/09 5:17 PM
MOTION for Jonathan L Rubin to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Kinin, Inc., Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Kinin, Inc., Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Rubin, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Appearance
84 84 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 04/09 5:12 PM
MOTION for Jonathan L Rubin to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Kinin, Inc., Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Kinin, Inc., Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Rubin, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Appearance