Consolidated
Lead case: 1:21-md-03010

New York Southern District Court
Judge:P Kevin Castel
Case #: 1:21-cv-06824
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:2 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Aug 13, 2021
Terminated:Dec 06, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 09, 2022 4:43 AM EST
Defendant
Facebook Inc.
Represented By
David Evan Ross
Seitz Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP
contact info
Defendant
Google LLC
Represented By
Andrew Dieter Cordo
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Coastal Point LLC
Represented By
Peter Bradford deLeeuw
Deleeuw Law LLC
contact info
Steven M Jodlowski
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd Llp (san Diego)
contact info
Steven Michael Jodlowski
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd
contact info
David W. Mitchell
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd Llp (sandiego)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 04/10 11:17 AM
ORDER granting (136) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (137) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-03446-PKC; granting (934) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (935) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC; granting (74) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (75) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06794-PKC; granting (84) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (85) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06796-PKC; granting (69) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (70) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06824-PKC; granting (79) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (80) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06828-PKC; granting (76) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (77) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06817-PKC; granting (94) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (95) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06840-PKC; granting (271) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (272) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06841-PKC; granting (119) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (120) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06870-PKC; granting (97) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (98) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06871-PKC; granting (76) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (77) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06881-PKC; granting (76) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (77) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06884-PKC; granting (85) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (86) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06888-PKC; granting (70) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (71) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06909-PKC; granting (80) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (81) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06910-PKC; granting (92) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (93) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06912-PKC; granting (222) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (223) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-07001-PKC; granting (179) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (180) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-07034-PKC; granting (84) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (85) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-07045-PKC; granting (67) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (68) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06915-PKC; granting (63) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (64) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-08032-PKC; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (66) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-09523-PKC; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-10186-PKC; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-10187-PKC; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-10188-PKC; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-01693-PKC; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-01701-PKC; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-01704-PKC; granting (67) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (68) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-01705-PKC; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-01971-PKC; granting (68) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (69) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-06997-PKC; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (43) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-09810-PKC; granting (104) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (105) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:23-cv-01530-PKC; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:23-cv-01532-PKC; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:23-cv-03651-PKC; granting (74) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (75) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:23-cv-05177-PKC; granting (28) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (29) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:24-cv-03063-PKC; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:24-cv-09904-PKC (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (Nacanther, Florence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
70 70 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 04/09 5:17 PM
MOTION for Jonathan L Rubin to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Kinin, Inc., Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Kinin, Inc., Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Rubin, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Appearance
69 69 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 04/09 5:12 PM
MOTION for Jonathan L Rubin to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Kinin, Inc., Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Kinin, Inc., Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Rubin, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Appearance