PAUL v. DIDIZIAN et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Colleen Kollar-Kotelly |
Case #: | 1:12-cv-01196 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 20, 2012 |
Terminated: | Jul 31, 2013 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 11, 2016 8:48 AM EDT |
Defendant
NOUBAR A. DIDIZIAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA OFFICE OF RISK MANAGEMENT DISABILITY COMPENSATION PROGRAM
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GHISLAINE PAUL
4810 Paul Hance Road
Huntingtown, MD 20639 |
GPO
Jul 31 2013
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 31, 2013. (lcckk1) |