Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey V Brown
Case #: 3:21-cv-00218
Nature of Suit490 Other Statutes - Cable/Sat TV
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Aug 19, 2021
Terminated:Jun 09, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 15, 2022 6:25 AM CST
Conflict Check Party
DISH DBS Corporation
Conflict Check Party
DISH Network Corporation
Conflict Check Party
DISH Technologies L.L.C.
Conflict Check Party
Dodge & Cox
Conflict Check Party
Kudelski Corporate, Inc.
Conflict Check Party
Kudelski SA
Conflict Check Party
Sling TV Holding L.L.C.
Defendant
Alejandro Galindo
Defendant
Anna Galindo
Defendant
Martha Galindo
Defendant
Osvaldo Galindo
Plaintiff
DISH Network L.L.C.
Hagan Noll & Boyle, LLC 820 Gessner, Suite 940
Houston, TX 77024
Represented By
Maleeah Marie Williams
Hagan Noll & Boyle, LLC
contact info
Timothy Michael Frank
Hagan Noll & Boyle LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
NagraStar LLC
Hagan Noll & Boyle, LLC 820 Gessner, Suite 940
Houston, TX 77024
Represented By
Maleeah Marie Williams
Hagan Noll & Boyle, LLC
contact info
Timothy Michael Frank
Hagan Noll & Boyle LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sling TV L.L.C.
Hagan Noll & Boyle, LLC 820 Gessner, Suite 940
Houston, TX 77024
Represented By
Maleeah Marie Williams
Hagan Noll & Boyle, LLC
contact info
Timothy Michael Frank
Hagan Noll & Boyle LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/30/2023 6:20 AM CDT
Thursday, August 19, 2021
1 1 12 pgs COMPLAINT against Alejandro Galindo, Anna Galindo, Martha Galindo, Osvaldo Galindo (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26920522) filed by DISH Network L.L.C., Sling TV L.L.C., NagraStar LLC.(Frank, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 2 pgs Request for Issuance of Summons as to Alejandro Galindo, Anna Galindo, Martha Galindo, Osvaldo Galindo, filed.(Frank, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Summons as to Anna Galindo,
Att: 2 2 pgs Request for Summons as to Martha Galindo,
Att: 3 2 pgs Request for Summons as to Osvaldo Galindo
3 3 2 pgs CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DISH Network L.L.C., NagraStar LLC, Sling TV L.L.C., filed.(Frank, Timothy)
Related: [-]