Original Case: 3:21-cv-00218

Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-pcf-40837
Typeprivate civil federal / private
Nature of Suit490 Other Statutes - Cable/Sat TV
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2022
Terminated:Jun 23, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 28, 2023 4:06 PM CST
Defendant - Appellant
Alejandro Galindo, doing business as Nitro TV, Individually and collectively
Represented By
Susan J. Clouthier
Clouthier Law, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Anna Galindo, doing business as Nitro TV, Individually and collectively
Represented By
Susan J. Clouthier
Clouthier Law, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Martha Galindo, doing business as Nitro TV, Individually and collectively
Represented By
Susan J. Clouthier
Clouthier Law, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Osvaldo Galindo, doing business as Nitro TV, Individually and collectively
Represented By
Susan J. Clouthier
Clouthier Law, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Dish Network, L.L.C.
Represented By
Timothy Frank
Hagan Noll & Boyle, L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
NagraStar L.L.C.
Represented By
Timothy Frank
Hagan Noll & Boyle, L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Sling TV L.L.C.
Represented By
Timothy Frank
Hagan Noll & Boyle, L.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/28/2023 4:06 PM CST
Friday, December 30, 2022
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Alejandro Galindo, Ms. Anna Galindo, Ms. Martha Galindo and Mr. Osvaldo Galindo 22-40837 (CCR)
Related: [-]
15 pgs OPPOSED MOTION for stay pending appeal [10012147-2]. Ruling is requested by: 12/30/2022. 22-40837 REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Mr. Alejandro Galindo, Ms. Anna Galindo, Ms. Martha Galindo and Mr. Osvaldo Galindo for stay pending appeal [10012147-2] Ruling is requested by: 12/30/2022. Date of service: 12/30/2022, via email - Attorney for Appellant: Clouthier; Attorney for Appellee: Frank. 22-40837 (Susan J. Clouthier )
Related: [-]
4 pgs INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [10012378-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 01/17/2023, for Appellants Alejandro Galindo, Anna Galindo, Martha Galindo and Osvaldo Galindo. 22-40837 (DLJ)
Related: [-]
COURT ORDER denying Motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellants Mr. Alejandro Galindo, Ms. Anna Galindo, Ms. Martha Galindo and Mr. Osvaldo Galindo [10012147-2] 22-40837 (WMJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs MOT-2 Letter
Att: 2 1 pgs Non Dispositive Court Order