Consolidated
Lead case: 1:21-md-03010

New York Southern District Court
Judge:P Kevin Castel
Case #: 1:21-cv-07045
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation (Monopolizing Trade)
Case Filed:Aug 20, 2021
Terminated:Mar 05, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 16, 2022 4:11 AM EST
Defendant
Google L.L.C
Plaintiff
Mint Rose Day Spa LLC
on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated 331 Boston Rd. Unit 2
Billerica, MA 01821
Represented By
Pamela Ann Markert
Cera LLP
contact info
Solomon B. Cera
Cera LLP
contact info
Pamela A. Markert
Cera LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SkinnySchool LLC
117 Pollard Street
N. Billerica, MA 01862
Represented By
Pamela Ann Markert
Cera LLP
contact info
Solomon B. Cera
Cera LLP
contact info
Pamela A. Markert
Cera LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 04/10 11:17 AM
ORDER granting (136) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (137) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-03446-PKC; granting (934) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (935) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC; granting (74) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (75) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06794-PKC; granting (84) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (85) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06796-PKC; granting (69) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (70) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06824-PKC; granting (79) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (80) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06828-PKC; granting (76) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (77) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06817-PKC; granting (94) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (95) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06840-PKC; granting (271) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (272) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06841-PKC; granting (119) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (120) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06870-PKC; granting (97) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (98) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06871-PKC; granting (76) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (77) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06881-PKC; granting (76) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (77) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06884-PKC; granting (85) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (86) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06888-PKC; granting (70) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (71) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06909-PKC; granting (80) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (81) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06910-PKC; granting (92) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (93) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06912-PKC; granting (222) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (223) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-07001-PKC; granting (179) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (180) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-07034-PKC; granting (84) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (85) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-07045-PKC; granting (67) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (68) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06915-PKC; granting (63) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (64) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-08032-PKC; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (66) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-09523-PKC; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-10186-PKC; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-10187-PKC; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-10188-PKC; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-01693-PKC; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-01701-PKC; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-01704-PKC; granting (67) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (68) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-01705-PKC; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-01971-PKC; granting (68) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (69) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-06997-PKC; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (43) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-09810-PKC; granting (104) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (105) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:23-cv-01530-PKC; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:23-cv-01532-PKC; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:23-cv-03651-PKC; granting (74) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (75) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:23-cv-05177-PKC; granting (28) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (29) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:24-cv-03063-PKC; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:24-cv-09904-PKC (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (Nacanther, Florence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
85 85 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 04/09 5:17 PM
MOTION for Jonathan L Rubin to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Kinin, Inc., Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Kinin, Inc., Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Rubin, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Appearance
84 84 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 04/09 5:12 PM
MOTION for Jonathan L Rubin to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Kinin, Inc., Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Kinin, Inc., Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Rubin, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Appearance