Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Marcos E Lopez
Case #: 3:21-cv-01390
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Aug 20, 2021
Re-opened:Feb 24, 2024
Terminated:Feb 24, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 16, 2022 4:38 AM AST
Defendant
Universal Insurance Company
Represented By
Luis R. Ramos-Cartagena
contact info
Edna M. Tejeda-Oyola
Casillas, Santiago & Torres LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Coco Rico LLC, NY
Represented By
Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
contact info
Julian R. Rivera-Aspinall
Rivera Aspinall, Garriga & Fernandini
contact info

GPO May 30 2023
OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 52 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 5/30/2023. (BB)
GPO May 30 2023
OPINION & ORDER denying 53 Defendant's Motion in Limine. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 5/30/2023. (BB)

Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM AST
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
147 147 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 01/22 11:45 AM
ORDER regarding146 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Granted. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 1/22/2025. (mcc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
146 146 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 01/21 5:37 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Juan R. Gonzalez-Munoz filed by Juan R. Gonzalez-Munoz on behalf of Universal Insurance Company. Responses due by 2/4/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Munoz, Juan)
Related: [-]