Original Case: 3:21-cv-01390

First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-civil-01328
Typecivil / private / contract
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 5:03 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
UNIVERSAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
Luis R. Ramos-Cartagena
Casillas Santiago & Torres LLC
contact info
Juan Rafael Gonzalez-Munoz
Gonzalez Munoz Law Offices PSC
contact info
Israel Fernandez-Rodriguez
Casillas Santiago & Torres LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
COCO RICO, LLC
Represented By
Julian R. Rivera-Aspinall
contact info
Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/11/2024 5:03 AM EDT
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #139) filed by Appellant Coco Rico, LLC. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 04/24/2024. 24-1328 (GRC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 25 pgs Abbreviated Record
Att: 2 7 pgs Case Opening Notice
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice Regarding Native PDF