Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11466

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:21-ap-51028
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2021
Terminated:Nov 15, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Arthrex Inc.
1370 Creekside Blvd.
Naples, FL 34108
Represented By
Arthrex Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Center City Healthcare, LLC
216 North Broad Street 4th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
Monique Bair DiSabatino
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC
216 North Broad Street 4th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
Monique Bair DiSabatino
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
18 18 misc Status Report Tue 01/24 10:53 AM
Status Report Fifth Interim Status Report of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
17 17 misc Status Report Tue 09/27 8:45 AM
Status Report Fourth Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
16 16 misc Status Report Wed 02/23 9:05 AM
Status Report Second Interim Report with Respect to the Status of Avoidance Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 15, 2021
15 15 notice Dismissal - Notice Mon 11/15 12:00 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 11/15 3:16 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51028 Closed (MB)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 12, 2021
14 14 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Fri 11/12 11:44 AM
Order Approving Settlement of Preference Claims Against Arthrex Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Related [+] Signed on 11/12/2021. (LMC)
Related: [-] 11 ,13
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
13 13 misc Certificate of No Objection(Adv) Wed 11/10 4:33 PM
Certificate of No Objection to Motion of Debtors for Approval of Settlement of Preference Claims Against Arthrex Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC. (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-] 11
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Monday, November 08, 2021
12 12 misc Status Report Mon 11/08 3:36 PM
Status Report Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
11 11 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion Tue 10/26 12:28 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 for Approval of Settlement of Preference Claims against Arthrex Inc. Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2021 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/9/2021. (DiSabatino, Monique)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 09/22 5:49 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Hearing scheduled for 9/23/2021 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
9 9 17 pgs order Order Tue 09/21 2:56 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Signed on 9/21/2021 (LMC)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 09/21 12:14 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Hearing scheduled for 9/23/2021 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
7 7 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Mon 09/20 6:49 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Debtors' Motion for Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, L.L.C., St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, L.L.C., TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
6 6 misc Exhibit Tue 09/07 5:52 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice of Filing of Exhibit D to Motion for Entry of an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] 5
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Avoidance Actions
Att: 2 Exhibit B - List of Proposed Mediators
Thursday, September 02, 2021
5 5 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Thu 09/02 1:44 PM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC, SCHC Pediatric Associates, LLC, St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC, TPS II of PA, LLC, TPS III of PA, L.L.C., TPS IV of PA, LLC, TPS V of PA, L.L.C.. Objections due by 9/16/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 01, 2021
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 09/01 1:03 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC, St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 09/01 1:01 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Arthrex Inc.. Related [+] (Demmy, John)
Related: [-] ument1
Monday, August 23, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 08/23 4:33 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51028 MFW] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10458127, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Mon 08/23 4:28 PM
Adversary case 21-51028 Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 & 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502(d) by Center City Healthcare, LLC, St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC against Arthrex Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 11/22/2021. (Demmy, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives