Alicea v. Cincinnati Incorporated et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | George A Otoole, Jr |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-11444 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Sep 02, 2021 |
Terminated: | Sep 30, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 01, 2022 3:58 AM EST |
Defendant
Cincinnati Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
New Automation Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Alicea
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, December 18, 2024 | ||
56 | 56
notice
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
Wed 12/18 3:15 PM
NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at[LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/transcripts.htm] (Kelly, Danielle) |
|
55 | 55
![]() Transcript of Motion Hearing held on September 5, 2024, before Judge George A. OToole. COA Case No. 24-1966 The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Jessica Leonard at jessicamichaelleonard@gmail.com. Redaction Request due 1/8/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/21/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/18/2025. (Kelly, Danielle) |