Original Case: 1:21-cv-11444

First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-civil-01966
Typecivil / private / torts
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2024
Last checked: Friday Oct 25, 2024 4:44 AM EDT
Defendant
NEW AUTOMATION CORPORATION, d/b/a PythonX, d/b/a Burlington Automation, d/b/a Lincoln Electric Company, d/b/a Lincoln Electric Holdings, Inc.
Defendant - Appellee
CINCINNATI INCORPORATED
Represented By
Andrew D. Black
Smith & Duggan LLP
contact info
Christopher Anthony Duggan
Smith Duggan Cornell & Gollub LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHRISTOPHER ALICEA, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Luis M. Prieto
Represented By
Peter J. Ainsworth
Meehan Boyle Black & Bogdanow PC
contact info
Robert F. Foster
Meehan Boyle Black & Bogdanow PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/25/2024 4:44 AM EDT
Thursday, October 24, 2024
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #52) filed by Appellant Christopher Alicea. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 11/07/2024. 24-1966 (AVN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 14 pgs Abbreviated Record
Att: 2 7 pgs Case Opening Notice
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice Regarding Native PDF